Societe Generale v. Escalera Resources Co et al

Plaintiff: Societe Generale
Defendant: Joel I Berson, Soccoro Properties LLC, Cecil Ray Weber Revocable Trust, Marshall & Winston Inc, Kathleen S Weber Revocable Trust, RJG LLC, EOG M Resources Inc, Blackstone Natural Resources II LP, Pidgeon Cay Associates LLC, The Allar Company, Oxy Y-1 Company, George R Salisbury Jr Mineral Trust, Stelbar Oil Corporation Inc, FREILLC-II, Friends of the Americas, Jacqueline E Chorney, IRW Holding Company LLC, Merit Energy Company LLC, The Jane Elizabeth Elwing Trust, Williamson Enterprises LLC, MAP 2004 LLC, M M Energy Inc, Front Range Energy Investors LLC, Jack Creek Land and Cattle Company, Tourmaline Exploration Company LLC, Merit Energy Partners III LP, Deanna Morrison, Weldon C Julander Trust, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, North Finn Limited Liability Company, Clarence J Wendt, EOG A Resources Inc, Black Stone Minerals Company LP, Walter S Fees Jr & Son Oil and Gas LLC, Merit Management Partners I LP, EOG Y Resources Inc, White Energy Corp, MAP 2003 LLC, O'Connell Partners LP, Janet K Dolar Revocable Trust, Escalera Resources Co and Mark S Dolar Revocable Trust
Case Number: 2:2018cv00221
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Deanna Morrison. (Court Staff, szf)
February 13, 2019 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by MAP 2004 LLC, MAP 2003 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Buckley, Lucas)
February 13, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of MAP 2003 LLC, MAP 2004 LLC (Buckley, Lucas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by White Energy Corp. (Buckley, Lucas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of White Energy Corp (Buckley, Lucas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by IRW Holding Company LLC. (Pearse, Timothy)
February 4, 2019 Filing 52 Letter from Joel Berson regarding 18-CV-221-C. (Court Staff, sal)
February 4, 2019 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Friends of the Americas. (Court Staff, sal)
January 30, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E Shields on behalf of North Finn Limited Liability Company (Shields, David)
January 30, 2019 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. EOG Y Resources Inc served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Dismiss filed by EOG A Resources Inc, EOG Y Resources Inc, EOG M Resources Inc. (Court Staff, sea)
January 30, 2019 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Tourmaline Exploration Company LLC served on 1/8/2019, answer due on 1/29/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 30, 2019 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. The Allar Company served on 1/15/2019, answer due on 2/5/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 30, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by Defendant North Finn Limited Liability Company Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Reese, Thomas)
January 30, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by North Finn Limited Liability Company. (Reese, Thomas)
January 29, 2019 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Friends of the Americas served on 1/15/2019, answer due on 2/5/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 28, 2019 Filing 42 First ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by George R Salisbury Jr Mineral Trust. (Starritt, Sam)
January 25, 2019 Filing 41 Motion to Dismiss and Disclaimer of Interest re #1 Complaint, by EOG M Resources Inc, EOG Y Resources Inc, EOG A Resources Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sutphin, Isaac) Modified event and text on 1/30/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg). Modified on 2/4/2019 (Court Staff, sea).
January 25, 2019 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Merit Energy Company LLC, Merit Energy Partners III LP, Merit Management Partners I LP,. (DeWald, JoAnna)
January 25, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Merit Management Partners I LP, Merit Energy Company LLC, Merit Energy Partners III LP. (DeWald, JoAnna)
January 25, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JoAnna S DeWald on behalf of Merit Energy Company LLC, Merit Energy Partners III LP, Merit Management Partners I LP (DeWald, JoAnna)
January 25, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Combs on behalf of Merit Energy Company LLC, Merit Energy Partners III LP, Merit Management Partners I LP (Combs, Susan)
January 24, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kathleen S Weber Revocable Trust, Cecil Ray Weber Revocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. North Finn Limited Liability Company served on 1/10/2019, answer due on 1/31/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 24, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Escalera Resources Co served on 1/13/2019, answer due on 2/4/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. IRW Holding Company LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due on 2/7/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. RJG LLC served on 1/16/2019, answer due on 2/6/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. MAP 2003 LLC served on 1/15/2019, answer due on 2/5/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. MAP 2004 LLC served on 1/15/2019, answer due on 2/5/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. M M Energy Inc served on 1/15/2019, answer due on 2/5/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Joel I Berson served on 1/16/2019, answer due on 2/6/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Blackstone Natural Resources II LP served on 1/15/2019, answer due on 2/5/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Clarence J Wendt served on 1/15/2019, answer due on 2/5/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Merit Energy Company LLC served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Merit Energy Partners III LP served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Soccoro Properties LLC served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. EOG A Resources Inc served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. EOG M Resources Inc served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. O'Connell Partners LP served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Marshall & Winston Inc served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Black Stone Minerals Company LP served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Anadarko Petroleum Corporation served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Oxy Y-1 Company served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Stelbar Oil Corporation Inc served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Merit Management Partners I LP served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. White Energy Corp served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. George R Salisbury Jr Mineral Trust served on 1/5/2019, answer due on 1/28/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Jack Creek Land and Cattle Company served on 1/5/2019, answer due on 1/28/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Kathleen S Weber Revocable Trust served on 1/5/2019, answer due on 1/28/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Cecil Ray Weber Revocable Trust served on 1/5/2019, answer due on 1/28/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Societe Generale. Walter S Fees Jr & Son Oil and Gas LLC served on 1/4/2019, answer due on 1/25/2019 (Reed, Randall)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Jane Elizabeth Elwing Trust, Jacqueline E Chorney. (McGath, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Societe Generale re #4 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds (Reed, Randall)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas F Reese on behalf of North Finn Limited Liability Company (Reese, Thomas)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #3 Motion to Deposit Funds (Court Staff, sea)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Make Deposit in Court filed by Plaintiff Societe Generale. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, sjlg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Societe Generale ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, sjlg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader and Declaratory Relief (40 summonses issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY30058.), filed by Societe Generale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sjlg) Modified filing date on 12/26/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Societe Generale v. Escalera Resources Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel I Berson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soccoro Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil Ray Weber Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall & Winston Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen S Weber Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG M Resources Inc
Represented By: Isaac Nathan Sutphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Natural Resources II LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pidgeon Cay Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Allar Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxy Y-1 Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George R Salisbury Jr Mineral Trust
Represented By: Sam D Starritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stelbar Oil Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREILLC-II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends of the Americas
Represented By: Diane Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline E Chorney
Represented By: Scott Alan McGath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRW Holding Company LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Pearse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merit Energy Company LLC
Represented By: Susan Combs
Represented By: JoAnna S DeWald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jane Elizabeth Elwing Trust
Represented By: Scott Alan McGath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAP 2004 LLC
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M M Energy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Front Range Energy Investors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Creek Land and Cattle Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tourmaline Exploration Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merit Energy Partners III LP
Represented By: Susan Combs
Represented By: JoAnna S DeWald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weldon C Julander Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Finn Limited Liability Company
Represented By: David E Shields
Represented By: Thomas F Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence J Wendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG A Resources Inc
Represented By: Isaac Nathan Sutphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Stone Minerals Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter S Fees Jr & Son Oil and Gas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merit Management Partners I LP
Represented By: Susan Combs
Represented By: JoAnna S DeWald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Y Resources Inc
Represented By: Isaac Nathan Sutphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Energy Corp
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAP 2003 LLC
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Connell Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet K Dolar Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escalera Resources Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S Dolar Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Societe Generale
Represented By: Randall B Reed
Represented By: Aaron John Lyttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?