Petzold et al v. NCC Business Services Inc

Plaintiff: Maridon Petzold and Mark Petzold
Defendant: NCC Business Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00222
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2019 09:00 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Court Staff, szf).
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Consent to Trial before Magistrate Judge by NCC Business Services Inc, Maridon Petzold, Mark Petzold. (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maridon Petzold, Mark Petzold in Sweetwater County District Court on December 12, 2018. NCC Business Services Inc served on 12/6/2018, answer due on 12/27/2018 (Court Staff, szf)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET for Sweetwater County District Court case CV-2018-000633. (Court Staff, szf)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Defendant NCC Business Services Inc of Filing State Court Docket Sheet and Record(CV-2018-000633) (Larson, Sean)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by NCC Business Services Inc. (Larson, Sean)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by NCC Business Services Inc (Court Staff, sbh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant NCC Business Services Inc: this case is non-complex (Court Staff, sbh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean M Larson on behalf of NCC Business Services Inc (Court Staff, sbh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of NCC Business Services Inc (Court Staff, sbh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed 11/13/2018 by Maridon Petzold, Mark Petzold (Court Staff, sbh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by NCC Business Services Inc from Third District Court, Sweetwater County, 18-00633 (Filing fee $ 400, CHY030075) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #4 Proposed Order on Removal) (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petzold et al v. NCC Business Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maridon Petzold
Represented By: Michael W Stulken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Petzold
Represented By: Michael W Stulken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCC Business Services Inc
Represented By: Sean M Larson
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?