Sterkel et al v. The Travelers Indemnity Company of America

Plaintiff: Sheila Sterkel and Rodney Sterkel
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00026
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Studer, Judith)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America,. The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Corp., & The Travelers Companies, Inc. added as corporate parents. (Studer, Judith) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 03:00 PM in Yellowstone Justice Center before Honorable Mark L. Carman. This is a telephonic hearing. Dialing instructions contained in notice. (Court Staff, sea) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company of America ; this case is non-complex. (Studer, Judith)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Studer, Judith)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Robert A. Krause re #6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Rodney Sterkel, Sheila Sterkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Krause, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheila Sterkel, Rodney Sterkel. The Travelers Indemnity Company of America served on 2/20/2019, answer due on 3/13/2019 (Krause, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiffs Rodney Sterkel, Sheila Sterkel ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, sjlg)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RECUSING MAGISTRATE JUDGE by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Due to a conflict of interest Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin has recused himself from the above-entitled action. All non-dispositive matters will be heard by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman.(Court Staff, szf)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Richards on behalf of Rodney Sterkel, Sheila Sterkel (Court Staff, sjlg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert A Krause on behalf of Rodney Sterkel, Sheila Sterkel (Court Staff, sjlg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt #Chy030321), filed by Sheila Sterkel, Rodney Sterkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sjlg) Added receipt number on 2/5/2019 (Court Staff, sbh). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/8/2019) (Court Staff, scat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterkel et al v. The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Sterkel
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Richards
Represented By: Robert A Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Sterkel
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Richards
Represented By: Robert A Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Judith A Studer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?