Nautilus Insurance Company v. Ashby Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Defendant: Tori Chilson, Crystal Beagle, Ashby Construction Inc, Janae Morton, Galen Patrick and Thomas Montoya
Case Number: 2:2019cv00032
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 29, 2019. (Court Staff, sjh)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of respond to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Lori)
March 11, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Kevin F Amatuzio. Receipt CHY030533. (Court Staff, sjk)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Kevin F. Amatuzio for Nautilus Insurance Company (Court Staff, szf)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Kevin F. Amatuzio to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bell, Lori)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Tori Chilson, Janae Morton, Thomas Montoya, Galen Patrick, and Crystal Beagle shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 8, 2019. (Court Staff, sjh)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Ashby Construction, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 8, 2019. (Court Staff, sjh)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response to Complaint by specific defendants filed by Plaintiff Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Lori)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Crystal Beagle served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019; Tori Chilson served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019; Thomas Montoya served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019; Janae Morton served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019; Galen Patrick served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Bell, Lori)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Defendant Ashby's Response to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Lori)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Ashby Construction Inc served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Bell, Lori) Modified to remove duplicative text on 2/28/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hampton K O'Neill on behalf of Ashby Construction Inc (O'Neill, Hampton)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Nautilus Insurance Company, identifying Corporate Parent W R Berkley Corporation for Nautilus Insurance Company. (Court Staff, sth) Modified on 2/12/2019 (Court Staff, sth). Modified text on 2/14/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Nautilus Insurance Company ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, sth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief(6 summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY030369.), filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 A-D Exhibit, #2 E-I Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 proposed consent) (Court Staff, sth) Modified on 2/14/2019 (Court Staff, sth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. Ashby Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tori Chilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Beagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashby Construction Inc
Represented By: Hampton K O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janae Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galen Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Lori K Bell
Represented By: Kevin F Amatuzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?