Lundahl v. Better Mortgage Corporation CEO et al

Plaintiff: Holli Lundahl
Defendant: Better Mortgage Corporation CEO, Better Mortgage Corporation, Vishal Garg and Bob Barker
Case Number: 2:2019cv00042
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Plaintiff Holli Lundahl. Case closed. (Court Staff, sbh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Court Staff, sbh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 First MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Better Mortgage Corporation, Better Mortgage Corporation CEO, Vishal Garg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Crank, Patrick)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants Better Mortgage Corporation, Better Mortgage Corporation CEO, Vishal Garg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crank, Patrick)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 First CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Better Mortgage Corporation (Crank, Patrick) Modified filers/text on 3/6/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Appendix, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Crank, Patrick)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal filed by Better Mortgage Corporation CEO, Better Mortgage Corporation, Vishal Garg by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Certified copy of order mailed to 8th District, Niobrara County; copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff) (Court Staff, sbh)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed on 1/29/2019 by Holli Lundahl (Court Staff, sbh)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Vishal Garg, Better Mortgage Corporation CEO, Better Mortgage Corporation from 8th District Court, Niobrara County, 19-00635 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #CHY030454) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundahl v. Better Mortgage Corporation CEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Mortgage Corporation CEO
Represented By: Abbigail Crank Forwood
Represented By: Patrick J Crank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Abbigail Crank Forwood
Represented By: Patrick J Crank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vishal Garg
Represented By: Abbigail Crank Forwood
Represented By: Patrick J Crank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holli Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?