Doty v. United States of America

Petitioner: Stewart Miles Doty
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00097
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl denying #3 Motion for Reconsideration. Copy of Order provided to Petitioner via US Mail. (Court Staff, scat)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Reconsideration re #2 Order on Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed on behalf of Petitioner Stewart Miles Doty. (Court Staff, szf)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl dismissing #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Stewart Miles Doty. Copy of Order provided to Petitioner via US Mail. (Court Staff, scat) Modified filed date on 5/17/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Stewart Miles Doty. (Court Staff, ssw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doty v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Eric J Heimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stewart Miles Doty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?