VanWagoner et al v. Singh et al

Plaintiff: Amy VanWagoner and Skyler VanWagoner
Defendant: Harpreet Singh and SAAB Logistics Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00099
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by SAAB Logistics Inc, Harpreet Singh. (Lacock, Traci)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 7/16/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by SAAB Logistics Inc,. (Lacock, Traci)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Skyler VanWagoner, Amy VanWagoner. Harpreet Singh served in Uinta County District Court Case #CV-2019-000080 on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Court Staff, sal)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skyler VanWagoner, Amy VanWagoner. SAAB Logistics Inc served in Uinta County District Court Case #CV-2019-000080 on 4/20/2019, answer due on 5/13/2019 (Court Staff, sal)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Uinta County District Court Case #CV-2019-000080). (Court Staff, sal)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order re #3 Order on Removal (TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS) by Defendants SAAB Logistics Inc, Harpreet Singh (Jerabek, Macrina) Modified on 5/24/2019 (Court Staff, sal).
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Macrina Margaret Jerabek on behalf of SAAB Logistics Inc, Harpreet Singh (Jerabek, Macrina)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of complexity by Defendants SAAB Logistics Inc, Harpreet Singh ; this case is non-complex. (Lacock, Traci)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by SAAB Logistics Inc, Harpreet Singh. (Lacock, Traci)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Traci L Lacock on behalf of SAAB Logistics Inc, Harpreet Singh (Lacock, Traci)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by SAAB Logistics Inc, Harpreet Singh by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Copy mailed to Third Judicial District Court - Uinta County)(Court Staff, ssw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Defendants SAAB Logistics Inc, Harpreet Singh. (Court Staff, ssw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed on 4/12/19 by Skyler VanWagoner, and Amy VanWagoner. (Court Staff, ssw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Third Judicial District Court - Uinta County, 19-80. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt CHY030920 ), filed by SAAB Logistics Inc, Harpreet Singh. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Consent Form) (Court Staff, ssw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VanWagoner et al v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy VanWagoner
Represented By: Alan Wayne Mortensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyler VanWagoner
Represented By: Alan Wayne Mortensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpreet Singh
Represented By: Macrina Margaret Jerabek
Represented By: Traci L Lacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAAB Logistics Inc
Represented By: Macrina Margaret Jerabek
Represented By: Traci L Lacock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?