Obray et al v. TW Schmidt & Sons Trucking LLC et al

Plaintiff: Daniel D Obray, Brayden Obray, Henry Obray, Jerimiah Obray and Shane Obray
Defendant: Donald Leebrick and TW Schmidt & Sons Trucking LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00100
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 9:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Joint NOTICE of Conference of the Parties and Plan for Discovery by Plaintiff Daniel D Obray (Marchetti, Marion) Text Modified on 7/12/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TW Schmidt & Sons Trucking LLC, Donald Leebrick by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Copy of order mailed to Second Judicial District Court - Carbon County)(Court Staff, ssw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand filed in STATE COURT on 5/3/19, by TW Schmidt & Sons Trucking LLC, Donald Leebrick. (Court Staff, ssw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in STATE COURT on 4/29/19 by Daniel D Obray, Shane Obray, Brayden Obray, Jerimiah Obray, Henry Obray. Donald Leebrick served on 4/19/2019, answer due on 5/10/2019; TW Schmidt & Sons Trucking LLC served on 4/16/2019, answer due on 5/7/2019 (Court Staff, ssw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Court Staff, ssw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Attachments: #1 State Court Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Summons Donald Leebrick, #4 State Court Summons TW Schmidt, #5 State Court Return Donald Leebrick, #6 State Court Return TW Schmidt, #7 State Court Answer, #8 State Court Notice of Removal, #9 State Court Certification Complete Record) (Helling, Steven)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal of Action to Federal Court by Defendants Donald Leebrick, TW Schmidt & Sons Trucking LLC to Carbon County District Court for the Second Judicial District (Court Staff, szf)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed in Carbon County District Court for the Second Judicial District on April 10, 2019 by Daniel D Obray, Shane Obray, Brayden Obray, Jerimiah Obray, Henry Obray. (Court Staff, szf)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Second Judicial District - Carbon County, Civil Action No. 19-61. (Filing fee $ 400 paid on 5/15/19 Receipt #CHY030921), filed by TW Schmidt & Sons Trucking LLC, Donald Leebrick. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Order on Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Consent to Proceed Before USMJ) (Court Staff, szf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/16/2019) (Court Staff, ssw). Modified text on 5/21/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obray et al v. TW Schmidt & Sons Trucking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel D Obray
Represented By: Erik J Oblasser
Represented By: Marion Francis Marchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brayden Obray
Represented By: Erik J Oblasser
Represented By: Marion Francis Marchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Obray
Represented By: Erik J Oblasser
Represented By: Marion Francis Marchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerimiah Obray
Represented By: Erik J Oblasser
Represented By: Marion Francis Marchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Obray
Represented By: Erik J Oblasser
Represented By: Marion Francis Marchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Leebrick
Represented By: Steven R Helling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TW Schmidt & Sons Trucking LLC
Represented By: Steven R Helling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?