Heigis v. Peak Wellness Center Inc et al

Plaintiff: Brett L Heigis
Defendant: Peak Wellness Center Inc Director, Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead, Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager, Rom Reedy, Donovan Grund, Aimee Foster and Peak Wellness Center Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00104
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 16 , #17 . Mail sent to Brett L Heigis. (Court Staff, sbh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Peak Wellness Center Inc, Peak Wellness Center Inc Director, Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead, Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager. (Hacker, Patrick) Text Modified on 7/10/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER STRIKING #15 Summons by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff)(Court Staff, ssw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. The Court construes #14 "Complaint for a Civil Case" hand delivered to the Court by plaintiff on June 25, 2019 as a response to the defendants' #11 motion to dismiss, rather than an amended complaint. Defendants shall have until July 9, 2019 to file any reply to the plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss. (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff)(Court Staff, ssw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 STRICKEN pursuant to 6/26/19 Order. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brett L Heigis: Peak Wellness Center Inc, Peak Wellness Center Inc Director, Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead, Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager served on 6/5/2019, answer due on 6/26/2019 (Court Staff, sbh) Modified on 6/26/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Brett L Heigis against Defendant Peak Wellness Center Inc, Peak Wellness Center Inc Director, Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead, Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh) Modified on 6/26/2019 pursuant to 6/25/19 Text Order (Court Staff, ssw).
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #8 Summons Returned Unexecuted. Mail sent to Brett L Heigis. (Court Staff, sbh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Peak Wellness Center Inc, Peak Wellness Center Inc Director, Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead, Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager. (Kendall, Erin) Text Modified on 6/20/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Peak Wellness Center Inc, Peak Wellness Center Inc Director, Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead, Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager. (Kendall, Erin) Text Modified on 6/20/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Brett L Heigis re #4 Summonses Returned Executed. (Court Staff, ssw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Brett L Heigis re #3 Order. (Court Staff, ssw)
June 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager answer deleted as summons was returned unexecuted. (Court Staff, ssw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Maureen Kendall on behalf of Peak Wellness Center Inc, Peak Wellness Center Inc Director, Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead, Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager (Kendall, Erin)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory P Hacker on behalf of Peak Wellness Center Inc, Peak Wellness Center Inc Director, Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead, Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager (Hacker, Gregory)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick E Hacker on behalf of Peak Wellness Center Inc, Peak Wellness Center Inc Director, Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead, Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager (Hacker, Patrick)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Brett L Heigis as to Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager. (Court Staff, ssw)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONSES Returned Executed by Brett L Heigis. Peak Wellness Center Inc served on 6/5/2019, answer due on 6/26/2019; Peak Wellness Center Inc Director served on 6/5/2019, answer due on 6/26/2019; Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead served on 6/5/2019, answer due on 6/26/2019; Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager served on 6/5/2019, answer due on 6/26/2019. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff)(Court Staff, ssw) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/7/2019) (Court Staff, ssw). Modified on 6/7/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Requiring Service under 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), and Setting Deadlines. (4 summonses issued and provided to US Marshal for Service. Copy of order and summonses mailed to plaintiff) (Court Staff, ssw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Brett L Heigis. (Court Staff, ssw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons issued), filed by Brett L Heigis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent Form) (Court Staff, ssw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heigis v. Peak Wellness Center Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Wellness Center Inc Director
Represented By: Gregory P Hacker
Represented By: Patrick E Hacker
Represented By: Erin Maureen Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Wellness Center Inc Residential Team Lead
Represented By: Gregory P Hacker
Represented By: Patrick E Hacker
Represented By: Erin Maureen Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Wellness Center Inc Specialized Services Program Manager
Represented By: Gregory P Hacker
Represented By: Patrick E Hacker
Represented By: Erin Maureen Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rom Reedy
Represented By: Gregory P Hacker
Represented By: Patrick E Hacker
Represented By: Erin Maureen Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donovan Grund
Represented By: Gregory P Hacker
Represented By: Patrick E Hacker
Represented By: Erin Maureen Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Foster
Represented By: Gregory P Hacker
Represented By: Patrick E Hacker
Represented By: Erin Maureen Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Wellness Center Inc
Represented By: Gregory P Hacker
Represented By: Patrick E Hacker
Represented By: Erin Maureen Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett L Heigis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?