DeHerrera v. Cheyenne Police Department Chief of Police et al

Plaintiff: Maria Isela DeHerrera
Defendant: Cheyenne Police Department Officer Eddy, Cheyenne Police Department Chief of Police, Cheyenne Police Department Sargent Solberg, Sprint Communications Company LP, Matthew Solberg, Brian Kozak, Steve Palso, CCT Wireless Inc, Lipsey Communications LLC, Jim Eddy, Cheyenne Police Department Officer and Cheyenne Police Department Sergeant
Case Number: 2:2019cv00111
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel E Ryckman on behalf of Sprint Communications Company LP (Ryckman, Rachel)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Defendant Sprint Communications Company LP's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint and Jury Demand or Other Responsive Pleading by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Defendants Sprint Communications Company LP shall file a responsive pleading on or before July 31, 2019. (Court Staff, scat)
July 18, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant Sprint Communications Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ryckman, Rachel)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff may respond to Defendants Brian Kozak, Jim Eddy, and Matthew Solberg's Motion to Dismiss #15 on or before July 31, 2019. (Court Staff, sjh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension to Answer #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Maria Isela DeHerrera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, sbh) Created link on 7/12/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
July 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Maria Isela DeHerrera. (Court Staff, ssw)
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Isela DeHerrera. Steve Palso served on 6/19/2019, answer due on 7/10/2019 (Court Staff, sal)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Jim Eddy, Brian Kozak, Matthew Solberg. (Attachments: #1 unpublished case) (Daraie, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Jim Eddy, Brian Kozak, Matthew Solberg. (Daraie, Justin)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Brian Kozak and Jim Eddy shall file a responsive pleading on or before July 5, 2019. (Court Staff, sjh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Jim Eddy, Brian Kozak (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Daraie, Justin) Modified filers on 6/25/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Ashkhan Daraie on behalf of Jim Eddy, Brian Kozak, Matthew Solberg (Daraie, Justin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Maria Isela DeHerrera: CCT Wireless Inc 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019 (Court Staff, sbh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Maria Isela DeHerrera as to CCT Wireless Inc (Court Staff, sbh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Isela DeHerrera: Sprint Communications Company LP served on 6/3/2019, answer due on 6/24/2019 (Court Staff, sbh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Isela DeHerrera: Lipsey Communications LLC served on 6/3/2019, answer due on 6/24/2019 (Court Staff, sbh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Isela DeHerrera: Matthew Solberg, Cheyenne Police Department Sergeant served on 6/13/2019, answer due on 7/5/2019 (Court Staff, sbh) Modified parties served and created answer deadline on 6/25/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Isela DeHerrera: Jim Eddy, Cheyenne Police Department Officer served on 6/3/2019, answer due on 6/24/2019 (Court Staff, sbh) Modified parties served and created answer deadline on 6/25/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Isela DeHerrera: Brian Kozak, Cheyenne Police Department Chief of Police served on 6/3/2019, answer due on 6/24/2019 (Court Staff, sbh) Modified parties served and created answer deadline on 6/25/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Cheyenne Police Department Chief of Police, Cheyenne Police Department Officer, Cheyenne Police Department Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stewart, Jon)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Cheyenne Police Department Chief of Police, Cheyenne Police Department Officer, Cheyenne Police Department Sergeant. (Stewart, Jon)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Mark Stewart on behalf of Cheyenne Police Department Chief of Police, Cheyenne Police Department Officer, Cheyenne Police Department Sergeant (Stewart, Jon)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($400) paid - receipt #CHY030991) filed by Maria Isela DeHerrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeHerrera v. Cheyenne Police Department Chief of Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheyenne Police Department Officer Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheyenne Police Department Chief of Police
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheyenne Police Department Sargent Solberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company LP
Represented By: Rachel E Ryckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Solberg
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kozak
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Palso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCT Wireless Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lipsey Communications LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Eddy
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheyenne Police Department Officer
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheyenne Police Department Sergeant
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Isela DeHerrera
Represented By: Scott Mitchel Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?