CUCU Inc v. Slickwraps Inc

Plaintiff: CUCU Inc
Defendant: Slickwraps Inc, Slickwraps Inc Director and Officer and Jonathan Endicott
Case Number: 2:2019cv00119
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Slickwraps Inc,. (Pope, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand, by Jonathan Endicott, Slickwraps Inc. (Pope, Jeffrey)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiff CUCU Inc, 2 issued. (Court Staff, sth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CUCU Inc. Slickwraps Inc Director and Officer served on 7/3/2019, answer due on 7/24/2019 (Rosenthal, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CUCU Inc. Slickwraps Inc served on 7/3/2019, answer due on 7/24/2019 (Rosenthal, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Praecipe for summonses filed by Plaintiff CUCU Inc, 3 issued. (Court Staff, sth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Jonathan Endicott, Slickwraps Inc, Slickwraps Inc Director and Officer with Jury Demand, filed by CUCU Inc. (Court Staff, sth)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by CUCU Inc. (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff CUCU Inc ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael B Rosenthal on behalf of CUCU Inc (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiff CUCU Inc, one (1) issued. (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (one summons issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY31074.), filed by CUCU Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUCU Inc v. Slickwraps Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slickwraps Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slickwraps Inc Director and Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Endicott
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CUCU Inc
Represented By: Michael B Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?