Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc et al v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary et al
Defendant: Northern Plains Resource Counsel
Petitioner: Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc, Western Fuels Wyoming Inc, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, The Wilderness Society, Natural Resources Defense Council, Western Fuels-Wyoming Inc, Western Organization of Resource Counsel and Powder River Basin Resource Counsel
Respondent: United States Department of the Interior Secretary, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, Gregory J Gould and David Bernhardt
Not Yet Classified: State of California and State of New Mexico
Amicus Curiae: Independent Petroleum Association of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00126
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc. United States Department of Interior served on 6/24/2019, answer due on 8/19/2019; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 6/24/2019, answer due on 8/19/2019 Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Mueller, R)
August 12, 2019 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc. Natural Resources Defense Council served on 6/24/2019, answer due on 7/15/2019 Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Mueller, R)
August 12, 2019 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cloud Peak Energy Inc, Wyoming Mining Association, Natural Resources Defense Council. United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 6/19/2019, answer due on 8/19/2019 Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cloud Peak Energy Inc, National Mining Association, Wyoming Mining Association. United States Department of Interior served on 06/19/2019, answer due 08/19/2019. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Petroleum Institute. Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director served on 6/24/2019, answer due on 8/23/2019; United States Department of Interior served on 6/19/2019, answer due on 8/19/2019; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 6/19/2019, answer due on 8/19/2019; Office of Natural Resources Revenue served on 6/24/2019, answer due on 8/23/2019 Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjlg) Modified text on 8/12/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 8, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re (28 in 2:19-cv-00120-SWS) MOTION to Intervene filed by Shannon Anderson, attorney Shannon Anderson appearing for Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization o filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Jaffe, Rebecca)
August 7, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Rosario C Doriott Dominguez. Receipt CHY031406. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Karl Obrecht on behalf of Independent Petroleum Association of America Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Obrecht, Alexander)
August 6, 2019 Filing 36 Amicus Curiae BRIEF In Support of Petitioners' Joint Motion for Preliminary Injunction re (23 in 2:19-cv-00120-SWS) Memorandum in Support of Motion, (22 in 2:19-cv-00120-SWS) Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amicus Independent Petroleum Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit) Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Leggette, Lyle)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (33) Motion to Intervene in case 2:19-cv-00120-SWS; granting (23) Motion to Intervene in case 2:19-cv-00121-SWS; granting (22) Motion to Intervene in case 2:19-cv-00126-SWS. State of California and State of New Mexico added as Intervenor Respondents.Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (43) Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief in case 2:19-cv-00120-SWS; granting (33) Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief in case 2:19-cv-00121-SWS; granting (32) Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief in case 2:19-cv-00126-SWS. IPAA may file its proposed amicus brief, including any exhibits or other attachments thereto, previously attached as Exhibit 1 to the motion.Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin in case 2:19-cv-00120-SWS; granting (42) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Rosario C Doriott Dominguez for Independent Petroleum Association of America in case 2:19-cv-00126-SWS Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf) Modified document link on 8/7/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
August 2, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by AUGUST 2, 2019 (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of deadline filed by Independent Petroleum Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amicus Curiae Brief iso Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 2 - Naatz Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Milito Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Leggette, Lyle) Modified filer on 8/5/2019 (Court Staff, scat). Modified text on 8/7/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
August 2, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Independent Petroleum Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Leggette, Lyle) Modified filer on 8/5/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
August 2, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lyle Poe Leggette on behalf of Indepandant Petroleum Association of America Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Leggette, Lyle) Modified filer on 8/5/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin in case 2:19-cv-00120-SWS; granting (24), (26), (27) Motions to appear pro hac vice admitting John Everett,George Torgun,David A Zonana for State of California in case 2:19-cv-00126-SWS Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin in case 2:19-cv-00120-SWS; granting (25) Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting William G Grantham for State of New Mexico in case 2:19-cv-00126-SWS Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, szf)
July 31, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for David A. Zonana to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Zars, Reed) Modified on 8/6/2019 to terminate motion Order entered on 7/31/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for George Torgun to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Zars, Reed) Modified on 8/6/2019 to terminate motion Order entered on 7/31/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for William G. Grantham to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Zars, Reed) Modified to terminate motion order entered on 7/31/2019 on 8/6/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John W. Everett to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Intervenor Respondent State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Zars, Reed) Modified to term motion on 8/6/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of (33 in 2:19-cv-00120-SWS) Motion to Intervene, filed by Intervenor Respondents State of California, State of New Mexico. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Zars, Reed)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene by states of California and New Mexico filed by Reed Zars filed by Intervenor Respondents State of California, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Zars, Reed)
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reed Zars on behalf of State of California, State of New Mexico Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Zars, Reed)
July 29, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Aaron Colangelo. Receipt CHY031340. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjk)
July 29, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Cecilia D Segal. Receipt CHY031343. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjk)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #29 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Cecilia D Segal for Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Counsel and granting #30 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Aaron Colangelo for Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource CounselAssociated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Court Staff, sal)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Aaron Colangelo to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, Western Organization of Resource Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Aaron Colangelo, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Anderson, Shannon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Cecilia Segal to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movants Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Cecilia Segal)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Anderson, Shannon)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by Shannon Anderson, attorney Shannon Anderson appearing for Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Counsel, filed by Movants Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Counsel, Powder River Basin Resource Counsel, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit NRDC declaration, #2 Affidavit TWS declaration, #3 Affidavit WORC-PRBRC-NPRC declaration, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene)Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Anderson, Shannon)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents may respond to Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #22 on or before August 16, 2019. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, sjh)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Preliminary Injunction Motion Response Deadline filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS(Jaffe, Rebecca)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on (22 in 2:19-cv-00120-SWS) Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (11 in 2:19-cv-00126-SWS) Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2019 01:30 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00120-SWS, 2:19-cv-00121-SWS, 2:19-cv-00126-SWS (Court Staff, scat)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases Pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is ordered that all future pleadings should only be filed in the lead case number 19-CV-120-SWS. (Court Staff, sjlg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Wurtzler, Gail)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Petitioner Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Trial Pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Petitioner Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wurtzler, Gail)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Rebecca J. Jaffe for Respondents by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of the Interior Secretary (Vassallo, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Gail L Wurtzler and Kathleen C Schroder. Receipt CHY031185. (Court Staff, sjk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Rebecca Jaffe to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondent United States Department of the Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Vassallo, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of United States Department of the Interior Secretary (Vassallo, Nicholas)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Gail L. Wurtzler and Kathleen C. Schroder for Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Gail L. Wurtzler and Kathleen C. Schroder to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioner Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Mueller, R)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc,. (Mueller, R) Modified restriction on 6/19/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Western Fuels Wyoming Inc, identifying Other Affiliate Western Fuels Association Inc for Western Fuels Wyoming Inc (Court Staff, sbh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW of Final Agency Action filed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Western Fuels Wyoming Inc (2 summonses issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY031085) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc et al v. United States Department of the Interior Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of the Interior Secretary
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory J Gould
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Rebecca J Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association Inc
Represented By: R Kirk Mueller
Represented By: Gail L Wurtzler
Represented By: Kathleen C Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Western Fuels Wyoming Inc
Represented By: Rex Johnson
Represented By: Brian D Artery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Basin Electric Power Cooperative
Represented By: Rex Johnson
Represented By: Brian D Artery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Cecilia D Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Cecilia D Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Western Fuels-Wyoming Inc
Represented By: Rex Johnson
Represented By: Brian D Artery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Western Organization of Resource Counsel
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Cecilia D Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Powder River Basin Resource Counsel
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Cecilia D Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of California
Represented By: George Torgun
Represented By: David A Zonana
Represented By: John Everett
Represented By: Reed Zars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Reed Zars
Represented By: William G Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Plains Resource Counsel
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Represented By: Cecilia D Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Independent Petroleum Association of America
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?