Coleman v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Timothy H Coleman
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2019cv00140
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy H Coleman. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/22/2019, answer due on 8/12/2019 (Merritt, Hannalore)
July 19, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Hannalore B Merritt. Receipt CHY031306. (Court Staff, sjk)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #4 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Hannalore B Merritt for Timothy H Coleman (Court Staff, sal)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Hannalore B. Merritt to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff Timothy H Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Crocker, Berthenia)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Court Staff, sal)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Timothy H Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, sal)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (3 summonses issued) (Filing fee not paid) filed by Timothy H Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy H Coleman
Represented By: Berthenia S Crocker
Represented By: Hannalore B Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?