Talcott v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Stephanie Talcott
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00141
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Talcott. United States of America served on 7/19/2019, answer due on 9/17/2019 (Rhodes, Diana) Modified text and answer date on 7/25/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Talcott. United States of America served on 7/15/2019, answer due on 9/13/2019 (Rhodes, Diana) Modified answer date on 7/19/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Stephanie Talcott (Rhodes, Diana) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summonses filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Talcott, 2 issued. (Court Staff, ssw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages Under the Federal Tort Claims Act ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY031207), filed by Stephanie Talcott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent Form) (Court Staff, ssw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talcott v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Talcott
Represented By: Diana Rhodes
Represented By: Fred H Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?