Noch v. Independent Film Development Corp et al
Plaintiff: Jake Noch
Defendant: Independent Film Development Corp, Jeffrey Maguire, Theo Hanson, Craig Loupelle and Robert Jeffery Maguire
Case Number: 2:2019cv00162
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Remanding Case to the First Judicial District, Laramie County, Wyoming by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Copy of order provided to Defendant via U.S. Mail, certified copy of order provided to Clerk of Court, First Judicial District. (Court Staff, scat)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to #10 Brief on Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Theo Hanson. (Court Staff, szf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed in State Court on 7/30/2019 by Jake Noch. Robert Jeffery Maguire served on 7/25/2019. (Court Staff, skb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed in State Court on 7/30/2019 by Jake Noch. Independent Film Development Corp served on 7/25/2019. (Court Staff, skb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed in State Court on 7/30/2019 by Jake Noch. Craig Loupelle served on 7/25/2019. (Court Staff, skb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed in State Court on 7/30/2019 by Jake Noch. Theo Hanson served on 7/25/2019. (Court Staff, skb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record sent by State District Court Clerk. (Court Staff, skb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental Addition to BRIEF Exhibit 1 Addition to Declaration of Jake Noch re #10 Brief filed by Plaintiff Jake Noch. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Addition to Declaration of Jake Noch) (Asay, Bruce)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's BRIEF On Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Jake Noch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration) (Asay, Bruce)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 Order Requiring Briefing on Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Theo Hanson (Court Staff, sbh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Independent Film Development Corp, Theo Hanson, Craig Loupelle, Robert Jeffery Maguire (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Envelope) (Court Staff, sbh) (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/22/2019) (Court Staff, sbh).
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Court Staff, sbh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record (Court Staff, sbh)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Briefing on Subject Matter Jurisdictionby the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Defendant Mr. Hanson shall file a brief, not to exceed 10 pages in length, setting forth its asserted bases for diversity jurisdiction on or before August 22, 2019. It is Further ORDERED that Plaintiff may, but is not required to, file his own brief on the issue of diversity jurisdiction, not to exceed 10 pages in length, also on or before August 22, 2019. Copy of Order provided to defendants via US Mail on this date. (Court Staff, scat)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Craig Loupelle, Theo Hanson, Robert Jeffrey Maguire, Independent Film Development Corp by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Provided to defendants via US Mail(Court Staff, scat) Modified on 8/8/2019 (Court Staff, scat). Modified on text 8/15/2019 (Court Staff, scat). Copy of Order Provided to State District Court via US Mail
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Theo Hanson, Independent Film Development Corp, Craig Loupelle, Robert Jeffrey Maguire. (Court Staff, ssw) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT, filed 7/23/19, by Jake Noch. (Court Staff, ssw)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Judicial District - Laramie County, 191-858. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt CHY031411), filed by Independent Film Development Corp, Theo Hanson, Craig Loupelle, Robert Jeffrey Maguire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, ssw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #3 Envelope) (Court Staff, ssw). Modified text on 8/15/2019 (Court Staff, scat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noch v. Independent Film Development Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Film Development Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theo Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Loupelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jeffery Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Noch
Represented By: Bruce S Asay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?