Whittecar v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Howard R Whittecar
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel, Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary, Robert Wilkie, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, James Byrne, United States Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary and United States Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00164
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel, United States Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary. (Martin, C)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel, United States Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martin, C)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time (Court Staff, sem)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendants United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel, United States Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, C)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C Levi Martin on behalf of United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel, United States Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary (Martin, C)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Howard R Whittecar ; this case is non-complex. (Walsh, Albert)
August 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: United States Department of Veterans Affairs answer due 9/11/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 First SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard R Whittecar. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 8/12/2019, answer due on 09/11/2019. Served through the Mark A. Klaassen/U.S. Attorney's Office for District of Wyoming. (Walsh, Albert) Modified answer date on 8/15/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Albert Kenneth Walsh on behalf of Howard R Whittecar (Walsh, Albert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Howard R Whittecar (4 summonses issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY031412) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittecar v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Byrne
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs Secretary
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs General Counsel
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard R Whittecar
Represented By: M Gregory Weisz
Represented By: Albert Kenneth Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?