Smith et al v. State of Wyoming et al
Plaintiff: Ron Smith, Scott Nelson, R&S Partnership, Ellen Nelson and Nelson Livestock
Defendant: Lori Galles, Loren Thompson, Cassie Wells, State of Wyoming, Lenora Simpson, Angela Morson, Tammy Maas, Anthony Warburton, Lindsey Smith and Mandy Lewis
Case Number: 2:2019cv00184
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #15 , #18 Motions to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/8/2019. (Court Staff, sbh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of time to respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Ellen Nelson, Scott Nelson, Nelson Livestock, R&S Partnership, Ron Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, sjlg)
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Drake D Hill on behalf of Ellen Nelson, Scott Nelson, Nelson Livestock, R&S Partnership, Ron Smith (Court Staff, sjlg)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re #18 Motion to Dismiss, #19 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Defendants State of Wyoming, Angela Morson, Lenora Simpson, Lori Galles, Anthony Warburton, Cassie Wells. (Peters, James) Modified filers on 10/16/2019 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 10/16/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Lori Galles, Angela Morson, Lenora Simpson, State of Wyoming, Anthony Warburton, Cassie Wells. (Peters, James) Modified filers on 10/16/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Lori Galles, Angela Morson, Lenora Simpson, State of Wyoming, Anthony Warburton, Cassie Wells. (Peters, James) Modified filers on 10/16/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Defendant Tammy Maas of Amended Certificate of Service re #15 Motion, #16 Brief (Vassallo, Nicholas) Added links on 10/28/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support of Motion to Dismiss Claim Against Tammy Maas in Her Individual Capacity re #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Tammy Maas. (Vassallo, Nicholas)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Claim Against Tammy Maas in Her Individual Capacity filed by Defendant Tammy Maas. (Vassallo, Nicholas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed in State Court on 9/25/19, by Plaintiffs Ellen Nelson, Scott Nelson, Nelson Livestock, R&S Partnership, Ron Smith. (Court Staff, ssw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed in State Court on 10/1/18 by Scott Nelson, R&S Partnership, Nelson Livestock, Ron Smith, Ellen Nelson. State of Wyoming served on 9/26/2018, answer due on 10/17/2018 (Court Staff, ssw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Court Staff, ssw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL OF STATE COURT RECORD by Defendant Loren Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Vassallo, Nicholas) Modified on 9/16/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until October 11, 2019, to respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall have until October 11, 2019, to file a motion to remand and contest the notice of removal. (Court Staff, sem)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of deadlines regarding extension of Answers to Amended Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Lori Galles, Angela Morson, Lenora Simpson, State of Wyoming, Anthony Warburton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peters, James) Modified on 9/10/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of Mandy Lewis, Tammy Maas, Lindsey Smith (Vassallo, Nicholas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandi Lee Monger on behalf of Lori Galles, Angela Morson, Lenora Simpson, State of Wyoming, Anthony Warburton (Monger, Brandi)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mackenzie Williams on behalf of Lori Galles, Angela Morson, Lenora Simpson, State of Wyoming, Anthony Warburton (Williams, Mackenzie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Bradley Peters on behalf of Lori Galles, Angela Morson, Lenora Simpson, State of Wyoming, Anthony Warburton (Peters, James)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal filed by Loren Thompson by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw) Certified Copy mailed to 8th Judicial District on 9/5/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of Loren Thompson (Court Staff, sbh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ron Smith, Scott Nelson, Ellen Nelson, R&S Partnership, Nelson Livestock filed in State Court on 8/13/2019 (Court Staff, sbh) Modified text on 9/4/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 8th District Court, Platte County, cv-2018-83 filed by Loren Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Amended State Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. State of Wyoming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Smith
Represented By: Drake D Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Nelson
Represented By: Drake D Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&S Partnership
Represented By: Drake D Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Nelson
Represented By: Drake D Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Livestock
Represented By: Drake D Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Galles
Represented By: James Bradley Peters
Represented By: Brandi Lee Monger
Represented By: Mackenzie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Thompson
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassie Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wyoming
Represented By: James Bradley Peters
Represented By: Brandi Lee Monger
Represented By: Mackenzie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenora Simpson
Represented By: James Bradley Peters
Represented By: Brandi Lee Monger
Represented By: Mackenzie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Morson
Represented By: James Bradley Peters
Represented By: Brandi Lee Monger
Represented By: Mackenzie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Maas
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Warburton
Represented By: James Bradley Peters
Represented By: Brandi Lee Monger
Represented By: Mackenzie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Smith
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Lewis
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?