United States of America v. Black
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Vernon Black
Case Number: 2:2019cv00188
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 07:181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 9:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Copy of Order mailed to pro se defendant)(Court Staff, ssw)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASESby the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Copy of order mailed to pro se defendant)(Court Staff, ssw)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vernon Black (Court Staff, sbh)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson denying #3 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Copy of order mailed to pro se defendant on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Martin, C)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Vernon Black (Court Staff, sbh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Vernon Black served on 9/10/2019, answer due on 10/1/2019 (Court Staff, sal)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Application for Injunctive Relief filed by United States of America (1 summons issued) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 9/12/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Represented By: Jeremy A Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?