Virgin Enterprises Limited v. Virginic LLC et al
Plaintiff: Virgin Enterprises Limited
Defendant: Berenika Maciejewicz, Virginic LLC, Paramount Labs 77 LLC, Virginic PL Sp z o.o and Virginic Labs LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00220
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #19 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Virgin Enterprises Limited (Woznick, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Virgin Enterprises Limited. (Morgan, Christian)
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, Dilution, Unfair Competition, Related State and Common Law Causes of Action, and Domestication of UK Judgment against all defendants, filed by Virgin Enterprises Limited. (Court Staff, szf)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order Alternative Service filed by Plaintiff Virgin Enterprises Limited. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF TOM M. MONAGAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Christian)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Paramount Labs 77 LLC, Virginic LLC, Virginic Labs LLC. (Hutchins, Clyde)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Paramount Labs 77 LLC, Virginic LLC, Virginic Labs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hutchins, Clyde)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 DISREGARD. Filing error. Refiled at #16 . MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Add Party filed by Defendants Paramount Labs 77 LLC, Virginic LLC, Virginic Labs LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hutchins, Clyde) Modified on 12/4/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. The Court grants the parties unopposed request for an extension to answer or respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Paramount Labs 77 LLC answer due 12/3/2019; Virginic LLC answer due 12/3/2019; Virginic Labs LLC answer due 12/3/2019(Court Staff, sjgc)
November 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde William Hutchins, Jr on behalf of Paramount Labs 77 LLC, Virginic LLC, Virginic Labs LLC (Hutchins, Clyde)
November 12, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $300 received for pro hac vice fees for Thomas M. Monagan, III, Joseph V. Norvell, and Christian S. Morgan. Receipt CHY031990. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Thomas M. Monagan, III; Joseph V. Norvell, and Christian S. Morgan for Virgin Enterprises Limited by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin.(Court Staff, szf)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Christian S. Morgan to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Virgin Enterprises Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Woznick, Timothy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Joseph V. Norvell to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Virgin Enterprises Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Woznick, Timothy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Thomas M. Monagan to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Virgin Enterprises Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Woznick, Timothy)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Lance Woznick on behalf of Virgin Enterprises Limited (Woznick, Timothy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Praecipe for Two issued summons filed by Plaintiff Virgin Enterprises Limited (Woznick, Timothy) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/6/2019) (Court Staff, sjlg).
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virgin Enterprises Limited. Paramount Labs 77 LLC served on 10/29/2019, answer due on 11/19/2019 (Woznick, Timothy)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virgin Enterprises Limited. Virginic Labs LLC served on 10/29/2019, answer due on 11/19/2019 (Woznick, Timothy) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/6/2019) (Court Staff, sjlg).
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virgin Enterprises Limited. Virginic LLC served on 10/29/2019, answer due on 11/19/2019 (Woznick, Timothy)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Virgin Enterprises Limited,. (Court Staff, sjlg)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Virgin Enterprises Limited ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, sjlg)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, Dilution, Unfair Competition, Related State and Common Law Causes of Action, and Domestication of UK Judgment (three summonses issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY31888.), filed by Virgin Enterprises Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit A Part 3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virgin Enterprises Limited v. Virginic LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berenika Maciejewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginic LLC
Represented By: Clyde William Hutchins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Labs 77 LLC
Represented By: Clyde William Hutchins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginic PL Sp z o.o
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginic Labs LLC
Represented By: Clyde William Hutchins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgin Enterprises Limited
Represented By: Timothy Lance Woznick
Represented By: Thomas M Monagan, III
Represented By: Christian S Morgan
Represented By: Joseph V Norvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?