Helena Resources Inc et al v. Wexpro Development Company et al
Plaintiff: Helena Resources Inc and Ephphatha Ministries International Inc
Defendant: QEP Energy Company, Wexpro II Company and Wexpro Development Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00239
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Please see notice for details.) (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2020 at 02:00 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Please see notice for instructions.) (Court Staff, sjlg)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting John F. Shepherd for QEP Energy Company by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
December 19, 2019 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of John F. Shepherd, $ 100, receipt number 1089-1690645 re #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Overdyke, Jere)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John F. Shepherd to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant QEP Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Overdyke, Jere)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (Overdyke, Jere)
December 3, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $300 received for pro hac vice fees for John E. Cutler, Michael W. Young, and Joseph D. Kesler. Receipt CHY032105. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #10 , #11 , and #12 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting John E. Cutler, Michael W. Young, and Joseph D. Kesler for Wexpro Development Company and Wexpro II Company by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin(Court Staff, szf)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Joseph D. Kesler to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Wexpro Development Company, Wexpro II Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit JD Kesler, #2 Proposed Order JD Kesler)(Stenquist, Jon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael Young to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Wexpro Development Company, Wexpro II Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mike Young, #2 Proposed Order MIke Young)(Stenquist, Jon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John Cutler to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Wexpro Development Company, Wexpro II Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John Cutler, #2 Proposed Order John Cutler)(Stenquist, Jon)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Wexpro II Company, Wexpro Development Company. (Stenquist, Jon) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/3/2019) (Court Staff, sal).
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon A Stenquist on behalf of Wexpro Development Company, Wexpro II Company (Stenquist, Jon)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS WEXPRO DEVELOPMENT COMPANY AND WEXPRO II COMPANY TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. On November 18, 2019, Defendant QEP Energy Company removed this case from state court. Plaintiffs and QEP are represented by counsel who are members of this Court's bar. At this time, the Wexpro Defendants are represented by counsel J.D. Kesler, who is not a member of this Court's bar. Mr. Kesler shall comply with USDCWY Local Rule 84.2 by 12/9/2019. By the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal.(Court Staff, ssp)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by QEP Energy Company by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Certified copy mailed to Sweetwater County Clerk on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by QEP Energy Company,. (Overdyke, Jere)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by QEP Energy Company. (Overdyke, Jere) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/3/2019) (Court Staff, sal). (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/3/2019) (Court Staff, sal).
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jere C Overdyke, III on behalf of QEP Energy Company (Overdyke, Jere)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint filed in Sweetwater County District Court (Civil Action No. 19-533-G) by Plaintiffs Ephphatha Ministries International Inc, Helena Resources Inc (Court Staff, sal)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (no summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($400) paid - receipt #CHY032028) filed by QEP Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, sal). Modified on 11/22/2019 (Court Staff, sal).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Resources Inc et al v. Wexpro Development Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QEP Energy Company
Represented By: Jere C Overdyke, III
Represented By: John F Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexpro II Company
Represented By: J D Kesler
Represented By: Michael W Young
Represented By: John E Cutler
Represented By: Joseph D Kesler
Represented By: Jon A Stenquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexpro Development Company
Represented By: J D Kesler
Represented By: Michael W Young
Represented By: John E Cutler
Represented By: Joseph D Kesler
Represented By: Jon A Stenquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Resources Inc
Represented By: J N Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ephphatha Ministries International Inc
Represented By: J N Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?