Black et al v. Occidental Petroleum Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Curry Farms LLC, Theresa M Williams, Norma Jean Smith, Val Eklund, Rita Kolkman, Eklund-Hansen Ranch LLC, Jolene M Simkins, J Michael Powers, Bert J McCauley, Jill M Strenger, Mina Bayne, Dennis A Black, Lois Fornstrom, John G Williams, Eklund Ranch LLC, Tracy Bagby, Sharon Eklund, Anita C Deselms, Rabou Investments LLC, Margaret E McCauley, Jami C Curry, Kelli Adkison, Phyllis A Cooney, Rabou Land Company LLC, Matthew W Curry, Jolene Leavitt, Richard Bagby, Karen Bryant, Rabou Resources LLC, Benjamin Adkison, Justin W Miller, Brandi J Miller, Russell I Williams, Jr, Melvin Fornstrom, Gross-Wilkinson Ranch LLC, Trustee Phyllis A Cooney, Trustee Karen Bryant and Trustee Anita C Deselms
Defendant: Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko Land Corp, Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc and Occidental Petroleum Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00243
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall have until February 3, 2020, to respond to the pending Motion to Dismiss. (Court Staff, sem)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Dennis A Black. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schuster, Robert)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #14 and #15 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Richard W. Clary and Benjamin Gruenstein for Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Anadarko Land Corp., Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc., and Occidental Petroleum Corporation by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf)
December 31, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Richard Clary and Benjamin Gruenstein. Receipt CHY032270. (Court Staff, sjk)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Frederick Eggers, III on behalf of Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Anadarko Land Corp, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc, Occidental Petroleum Corporation (Eggers, Walter)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Benjamin Gruenstein to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Anadarko Land Corp, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc, Occidental Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Micheli, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Richard W. Clary to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Defendants Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Anadarko Land Corp, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc, Occidental Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Micheli, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Micheli on behalf of Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Anadarko Land Corp, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc, Occidental Petroleum Corporation (Micheli, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Anadarko Land Corp, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Anadarko Land Corp, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc, Occidental Petroleum Corporation.. (Micheli, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Anadarko Land Corp, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc, Occidental Petroleum Corporation. (Micheli, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendants Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, Anadarko Land Corp, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc, Occidental Petroleum Corporation. (Micheli, Matthew) Modified text and added link on 1/7/2020 (Court Staff, sjlg).
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin.The Court grants Defendants' unopposed request for a fourteen day extension to file an answer. Defendants' answer is due on or before December 30, 2019. (Court Staff, sjgc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Val Eklund, Sharon Eklund, Richard Bagby, Gross-Wilkinson Ranch LLC, Phyllis A Cooney, Rabou Land Company LLC, Jolene Leavitt, Dennis A Black, Rabou Resources LLC, Justin W Miller, Rabou Investments LLC, Phyllis A Cooney(individually), Eklund Ranch LLC, Curry Farms LLC, Russell I Williams, Jr, Norma Jean Smith, Kelli Adkison, J Michael Powers, Brandi J Miller, Lois Fornstrom, Tracy Bagby, Jami C Curry, Theresa M Williams, Benjamin Adkison, Eklund-Hansen Ranch LLC, Mina Bayne, Rita Kolkman, Margaret E McCauley, John G Williams, Matthew W Curry, Karen Bryant, Bert J McCauley, Anita C Deselms(individually), Melvin Fornstrom, Karen Bryant(individually), Jill M Strenger, Jolene M Simkins, Anita C Deselms. Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc served on 11/26/2019, answer due on 12/17/2019 (Long, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Val Eklund, Sharon Eklund, Richard Bagby, Gross-Wilkinson Ranch LLC, Phyllis A Cooney, Rabou Land Company LLC, Jolene Leavitt, Dennis A Black, Rabou Resources LLC, Justin W Miller, Rabou Investments LLC, Phyllis A Cooney(individually), Eklund Ranch LLC, Curry Farms LLC, Russell I Williams, Jr, Norma Jean Smith, Kelli Adkison, J Michael Powers, Brandi J Miller, Lois Fornstrom, Tracy Bagby, Jami C Curry, Theresa M Williams, Benjamin Adkison, Eklund-Hansen Ranch LLC, Mina Bayne, Rita Kolkman, Margaret E McCauley, John G Williams, Matthew W Curry, Karen Bryant, Bert J McCauley, Anita C Deselms(individually), Melvin Fornstrom, Karen Bryant(individually), Jill M Strenger, Jolene M Simkins, Anita C Deselms. Anadarko Petroleum Corporation served on 11/25/2019, answer due on 12/16/2019 (Court Staff, sal)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Val Eklund, Sharon Eklund, Richard Bagby, Gross-Wilkinson Ranch LLC, Phyllis A Cooney, Rabou Land Company LLC, Jolene Leavitt, Dennis A Black, Rabou Resources LLC, Justin W Miller, Rabou Investments LLC, Phyllis A Cooney(individually), Eklund Ranch LLC, Curry Farms LLC, Russell I Williams, Jr, Norma Jean Smith, Kelli Adkison, J Michael Powers, Brandi J Miller, Lois Fornstrom, Tracy Bagby, Jami C Curry, Theresa M Williams, Benjamin Adkison, Eklund-Hansen Ranch LLC, Mina Bayne, Rita Kolkman, Margaret E McCauley, John G Williams, Matthew W Curry, Karen Bryant, Bert J McCauley, Anita C Deselms(individually), Melvin Fornstrom, Karen Bryant(individually), Jill M Strenger, Jolene M Simkins, Anita C Deselms. Anadarko Land Corp served on 11/25/2019, answer due on 12/16/2019 (Court Staff, sal)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Val Eklund, Sharon Eklund, Richard Bagby, Gross-Wilkinson Ranch LLC, Phyllis A Cooney, Rabou Land Company LLC, Jolene Leavitt, Dennis A Black, Rabou Resources LLC, Justin W Miller, Rabou Investments LLC, Phyllis A Cooney(individually), Eklund Ranch LLC, Curry Farms LLC, Russell I Williams, Jr, Norma Jean Smith, Kelli Adkison, J Michael Powers, Brandi J Miller, Lois Fornstrom, Tracy Bagby, Jami C Curry, Theresa M Williams, Benjamin Adkison, Eklund-Hansen Ranch LLC, Mina Bayne, Rita Kolkman, Margaret E McCauley, John G Williams, Matthew W Curry, Karen Bryant, Bert J McCauley, Anita C Deselms(individually), Melvin Fornstrom, Karen Bryant(individually), Jill M Strenger, Jolene M Simkins, Anita C Deselms. Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due on 12/16/2019 (Court Staff, sal)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Val Eklund, Sharon Eklund, Richard Bagby, Gross-Wilkinson Ranch LLC, Phyllis A Cooney, Rabou Land Company LLC, Jolene Leavitt, Dennis A Black, Rabou Resources LLC, Justin W Miller, Rabou Investments LLC, Phyllis A Cooney(individually), Eklund Ranch LLC, Curry Farms LLC, Russell I Williams, Jr, Norma Jean Smith, Kelli Adkison, J Michael Powers, Brandi J Miller, Lois Fornstrom, Tracy Bagby, Jami C Curry, Theresa M Williams, Benjamin Adkison, Eklund-Hansen Ranch LLC, Mina Bayne, Rita Kolkman, Margaret E McCauley, John G Williams, Matthew W Curry, Karen Bryant, Bert J McCauley, Anita C Deselms(individually), Melvin Fornstrom, Karen Bryant(individually), Jill M Strenger, Jolene M Simkins, Anita C Deselms. Occidental Petroleum Corporation served on 11/25/2019, answer due on 12/16/2019 (Court Staff, sal)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Complexity by Plaintiffs Benjamin Adkison, Kelli Adkison, Richard Bagby, Tracy Bagby, Mina Bayne, Dennis A Black, Karen Bryant, Karen Bryant, Phyllis A Cooney, Phyllis A Cooney, Jami C Curry, Matthew W Curry, Curry Farms LLC, Anita C Deselms, Anita C Deselms, Sharon Eklund, Val Eklund, Eklund Ranch LLC, Eklund-Hansen Ranch LLC, Lois Fornstrom, Melvin Fornstrom, Gross-Wilkinson Ranch LLC, Rita Kolkman, Jolene Leavitt, Bert J McCauley, Margaret E McCauley, Brandi J Miller, Justin W Miller, J Michael Powers, Rabou Investments LLC, Rabou Land Company LLC, Rabou Resources LLC, Jolene M Simkins, Norma Jean Smith, Jill M Strenger, John G Williams, Russell I Williams, Jr, Theresa M Williams, this case is complex. (Court Staff, sal)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Adkison, Kelli Adkison, Richard Bagby, Tracy Bagby, Mina Bayne, Dennis A Black, Karen Bryant, Karen Bryant, Phyllis A Cooney, Phyllis A Cooney, Jami C Curry, Matthew W Curry, Curry Farms LLC, Anita C Deselms, Anita C Deselms, Sharon Eklund, Val Eklund, Eklund Ranch LLC, Eklund-Hansen Ranch LLC, Lois Fornstrom, Melvin Fornstrom, Gross-Wilkinson Ranch LLC, Rita Kolkman, Jolene Leavitt, Bert J McCauley, Margaret E McCauley, Brandi J Miller, Justin W Miller, J Michael Powers, Rabou Investments LLC, Rabou Land Company LLC, Rabou Resources LLC, Jolene M Simkins, Norma Jean Smith, Jill M Strenger, John G Williams, Russell I Williams, Jr, Theresa M Williams, 5 issued. (Court Staff, sal)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summonses issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($400) paid - receipt #CHY032061) filed by Val Eklund, Sharon Eklund, Richard Bagby, Gross-Wilkinson Ranch LLC, Phyllis A Cooney, Rabou Land Company LLC, Jolene Leavitt, Dennis A Black, Rabou Resources LLC, Justin W Miller, Rabou Investments LLC, Phyllis A Cooney(individually), Eklund Ranch LLC, Curry Farms LLC, Russell I Williams, Jr, Norma Jean Smith, Kelli Adkison, J Michael Powers, Brandi J Miller, Lois Fornstrom, Tracy Bagby, Jami C Curry, Theresa M Williams, Benjamin Adkison, Eklund-Hansen Ranch LLC, Mina Bayne, Rita Kolkman, Margaret E McCauley, John G Williams, Matthew W Curry, Karen Bryant, Bert J McCauley, Anita C Deselms(individually), Melvin Fornstrom, Karen Bryant(individually), Jill M Strenger, Jolene M Simkins, Anita C Deselms. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black et al v. Occidental Petroleum Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curry Farms LLC
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa M Williams
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Jean Smith
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Val Eklund
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Kolkman
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eklund-Hansen Ranch LLC
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene M Simkins
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Michael Powers
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bert J McCauley
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill M Strenger
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mina Bayne
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis A Black
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Fornstrom
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John G Williams
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eklund Ranch LLC
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Bagby
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Eklund
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita C Deselms
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabou Investments LLC
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret E McCauley
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami C Curry
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Adkison
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis A Cooney
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabou Land Company LLC
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew W Curry
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Leavitt
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bagby
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bryant
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabou Resources LLC
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Adkison
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin W Miller
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi J Miller
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell I Williams, Jr
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Fornstrom
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gross-Wilkinson Ranch LLC
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Phyllis A Cooney
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Karen Bryant
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Anita C Deselms
Represented By: Justin Ashkhan Daraie
Represented By: Kristopher C Koski
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Thomas N Long
Represented By: Robert P Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Gruenstein
Represented By: Walter Frederick Eggers, III
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Matthew J Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Gruenstein
Represented By: Walter Frederick Eggers, III
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Matthew J Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Land Corp
Represented By: Benjamin Gruenstein
Represented By: Walter Frederick Eggers, III
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Matthew J Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baseball Merger Sub 1 Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Gruenstein
Represented By: Walter Frederick Eggers, III
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Matthew J Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Gruenstein
Represented By: Walter Frederick Eggers, III
Represented By: Richard W Clary
Represented By: Matthew J Micheli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?