Saathoff v. Easton Technical Products Inc
Plaintiff: Desirae Saathoff
Defendant: Easton Technical Products Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00250
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #4 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jonathan M Menuez for Easton Technical Products Inc (Court Staff, sjlg)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jonathan M. Menuez to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Easton Technical Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Granting Admission of Jonathan M. Menuez Pro Hac Vice)(Lansing, Michael)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Counsel may appear by telephone; counsel to participate by using the following conference call-in: Toll-free number: 877-336-1829 Access Code: 3509533 Security Code: 2967 (Please see Notice for additional details.) (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Easton Technical Products Inc. (Lansing, Michael)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($400) receipt #CHY032135) filed by Desirae Saathoff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saathoff v. Easton Technical Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desirae Saathoff
Represented By: Alexander F Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easton Technical Products Inc
Represented By: Michael John Lansing
Represented By: Jonathan M Menuez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?