Nautica Entertainment, LLC v. Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nautica Entertainment LLC
Defendant: Robert W Jennings, Allied Debt Collection of Virginia LLC and Michael Zarrelli
Case Number: 2:2020cv00024
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Case reassigned to Honorable Kelly H. Rankin for all further proceedings; Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal no longer assigned to case.(Court Staff, szf)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02524.
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order of Case Transfer. With the agreement of the parties, it is hereby ordered that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming. The parties stipulated and agreed that Allied, Jennings and Zarrelli consent to jurisdiction and venue in the District of Wyoming for purposes of this action. Upon transfer of this action to the District of Wyoming, the parties shall jointly move to have this action consolidated with the case captioned Nautica Entertainment, LLC v. Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, United States District Court, District of Wyoming, Case No. 19-CV-174. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/13/2020. (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Minute Order [non-document] of Case Management Conference held on 2/6/2020. At the conference, counsel for the parties acknowledged that venue was proper in the District of Wyoming. Accordingly, the parties agreed to transfer the case to the District of Wyoming and seek consolidation with a related contract dispute that is ongoing in that court between these same parties. Transfer Order shall issue.. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 2/13/2020. Time: 45 minutes (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and L.R. 16.3(b) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Levasseur, Eric) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion to excuse appearance of Defendants at the Case Management Conference. Defendants shall be available by telephone, if needed. (Related Doc #17 ). Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 1/30/2020.(R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to excuse appearance filed by Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, Robert W. Jennings, Michael Zarrelli. (Milligan, Patrick) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 Opposition to #9 Motion to dismiss filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Levasseur, Eric) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 2/6/2020 at 03:00 PM at Chambers 17A before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 12/9/2019. (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Robert W. Jennings placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: ordinary mail. (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Request to Clerk for service upon Robert W. Jennings by Ordinary Mail. filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing)(Levasseur, Eric) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Robert W. Jennings. Service attempted by certified mail filed on behalf of Nautica Entertainment, LLC Related document(s) #2 . (J,G) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, Robert W. Jennings, Michael Zarrelli. (Milligan, Patrick) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to dismiss filed by Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, Robert W. Jennings, Michael Zarrelli. Related document(s) #1 . (Milligan, Patrick) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Patrick J. Milligan filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Milligan, Patrick) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Michael Zarrelli placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: ordinary mail. (J,G) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Request to Clerk for service upon Michael Zarrelli by Ordinary Mail. filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing)(Levasseur, Eric) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Michael Zarrelli. Service attempted by certified mail filed on behalf of Nautica Entertainment, LLC Related document(s) #2 . (J,G) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC on 11/1/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Nautica Entertainment, LLC Related document(s) #2 . (W,CM) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Levasseur, Eric) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, Robert W. Jennings, Michael Zarrelli. (Attachments: #1 Summons R. Jennings, #2 Summons M. Zarrelli, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, receipt #70181830000061324303, Robert W. Jennings, receipt #70181830000061321050, and Michael Zarrelli, receipt #70181830000061324280 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, Robert W. Jennings, Michael Zarrelli. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9598192.. Filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Assignment for Value of LLC Claims, #2 Exhibit B - Voluntary Petition, #3 Exhibit C - Sale Objection, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Statement of Financial Affairs, #5 Exhibit E - Sale Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Allied Debt Collection, #8 Summons Robert Jennings Summons, #9 Summons Michael Zarrelli Summons) (Levasseur, Eric) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautica Entertainment, LLC v. Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Jennings
Represented By: Patrick J. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Debt Collection of Virginia LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zarrelli
Represented By: Patrick J. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautica Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Dennis R Rose
Represented By: Eric B Levasseur
Represented By: Anna L. Gecht
Represented By: Rocco I Debitetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?