Szablewski v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Linda J Szablewski
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv00054
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00132.
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue). On March 31, 2020, this case was transferred to the Eastern District of Washington. ECF No. #8 . However, the transfer was in error, as the proper receiving district is the District of Wyoming. ECF No. #1 . Accordingly, the District Court Clerk is hereby directed to transfer this case to the District of Wyoming. This text-only entry constitutes the Courts ruling on the matter. Case transferred to District of Wyoming. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-01440. Docket sheet received. [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Case Transferred to the Eastern District of Washington via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/31/2020.] [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/31/2020.] [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/31/2020.] [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (Third). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/31/2020.] [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 4 *Attorney notified to file all documents in lead case* NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G Guajardo on behalf of Linda J Szablewski. (Guajardo, Michael) *Modified on 5/11/2018 (SLQ). [Transferred from Arizona on 3/31/2020.] [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]
May 11, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Michael G Guajardo on behalf of Linda J Szablewski. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/31/2020.] [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-1440-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/31/2020.] [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Linda J Szablewski. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/31/2020.] [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15484614 filed by Linda J Szablewski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/31/2020.] [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 3/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szablewski v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J Szablewski
Represented By: Michael G Guajardo
Represented By: J Gregory Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?