Houska v. Newkota Services & Rentals LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scott Houska
Defendant: Newkota Services & Rentals LLC, FMC Technologies, Roger Cross and Donald J Gawick
Case Number: 2:2020cv00068
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Scott Houska. (Johnson, Jason)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Lee Tysse on behalf of Donald J Gawick (Tysse, Holly)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support of #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant FMC Technologies. (Henderson, Codie) Modified text and added link on 6/8/2020 (Court Staff, sjlg).
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant FMC Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Codie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Finding good cause, the Motion is granted. Mr. Gawick must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than July 1, 2020.(Court Staff, sem)
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of response to Complaint filed by Defendant Donald J Gawick. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Good, Amanda)
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Marie Good on behalf of Donald J Gawick (Good, Amanda)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendant Newkota Services & Rentals LLC. (Worthen, James)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Newkota Services & Rentals LLC. (Worthen, James)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Worthen on behalf of Newkota Services & Rentals LLC (Worthen, James)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meggan Jo Nicholas on behalf of Newkota Services & Rentals LLC (Nicholas, Meggan)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Finding good cause, the Motion is granted. Defendants shall have until June 8, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Court Staff, sem)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response to Complaint filed by Defendant FMC Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Esch, Amanda)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Codie D Henderson on behalf of FMC Technologies (Henderson, Codie)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda F Esch on behalf of FMC Technologies (Esch, Amanda)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiff Scott Houska, 4 issued. (Court Staff, sth)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (4summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY032890.), filed by Scott Houska. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 consent) (Court Staff, sth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houska v. Newkota Services & Rentals LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newkota Services & Rentals LLC
Represented By: James C Worthen
Represented By: Meggan Jo Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Technologies
Represented By: Amanda F Esch
Represented By: Codie D Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J Gawick
Represented By: Holly Lee Tysse
Represented By: Amanda Marie Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Houska
Represented By: Jason Johnson
Represented By: Justin Kallal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?