Martin v. Laramie County et al
Plaintiff: Sean M Martin
Defendant: Laramie County and Wyoming Attorney General Division of Criminal Investigation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00133
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. (Court Staff, skb)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT ON 28 U.S.C. 1915 SCREENING by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. It is ORDERED that Sean Martin's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED, and his non-prisoner pro se Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED.(Copy of order sent to plaintiff via US mail on this date.) (Court Staff, skb) Modified on 8/3/2020 (Court Staff, skb). Modified on 8/4/2020 (Court Staff, skb).
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Sean M Martin (Court Staff, sbh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sean M Martin (0 summons(es) issued) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Laramie County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramie County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Attorney General Division of Criminal Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?