Frank et al v. Wyoming Secretary of State et al
Plaintiff: Grassfire LLC and John C Frank
Defendant: Wyoming Secretary of State, Laramie County District Attorney, Laramie County Clerk, Debra Lee, Leigh Ann Manlove and Ed Buchanan
Not Yet Classified: Jennifer Horal
Case Number: 2:2020cv00138
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 93 APPEAL ORDER from USCA granting motion to supplement the record on appeal. The relief the appellees are seeking is leave to file appendix materials conventionally. The appellees may file their supplemental appendix in hard copy only. They shall submit two identical copies of the CD or DVD with the hard copies of the second brief on cross-appeal (please see order for further details). [21-8058, 21-8059, 21-8060] (Court Staff, stbd)
October 4, 2021 Filing 92 Appeal Remark re #71 Notice of Appeal (Attorney), #73 Notice of Appeal (Attorney), #77 Notice of Cross Appeal (Attorney). Appellants' brief and appendix due on 11/10/2021 for Debra Lee, Ed Buchanan and Leigh Ann Manlove. Please refer to USCA 09/08/2021 order for additional briefing information. [21-8058, 21-8059, 21-8060] (Court Staff, stbd)
October 1, 2021 Filing 91 Transcript Letter transmitted to USCA re #71 Notice of Appeal (Attorney)[21-8058, #73 Notice of Appeal (Attorney)[21-8059], #77 Notice of Cross Appeal (Attorney)[21-8060]. All transcripts ordered for this appeal are now filed with the United States District Court, District of Wyoming. For purposes of appeal, the record is now ready. (Court Staff, stbd)
September 22, 2021 Filing 90 Appeal Remark re #71 Notice of Appeal (Attorney), #73 Notice of Appeal (Attorney), #77 Notice of Cross Appeal (Attorney). Record on appeal/Notice due 10/13/2021 for 21-8058, 21-8059, and 21-8060. (Court Staff, stbd)
September 22, 2021 Filing 89 Transcript Letter transmitted to USCA re #73 Notice of Appeal (Attorney). All transcripts that have been ordered from this reporter for this appeal are now filed with the United States District Court, District of Wyoming. (Davis, Jan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing - Dispositive Motions held on 7/19/2021 before Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal re #73 Notice of Appeal (Attorney). To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Jan Davis, phone (307) 314-2356 or email jbd.davis@gmail.com. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction. Notice of Intent to Redact due 9/29/2021. Notice of Redaction Request due 10/13/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2021. (Davis, Jan)
September 10, 2021 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (No Transcripts Necessary) by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC re #77 Notice of Cross Appeal (Attorney). (Klein, Stephen)
September 8, 2021 Filing 86 APPEAL ORDER from USCA This matter is before the court on our own motion to set a briefing schedule for these cross-appeals. Given the procedural history in the district court, this court will partially consolidate briefing, as provided in this order. Defendants-Appellants shall file a single consolidated brief and appendix within 40 days after the district court notifies the parties and this court that the record is complete. See order for details and additional information. [21-8058, 21-8059, 21-8060] (Court Staff, stbd)
September 3, 2021 Filing 85 (TEXT-ONLY) APPEAL ORDER from USCA as to #71 Notice of Appeal (Attorney) filed by Laramie County Clerk, #77 Notice of Cross Appeal (Attorney) filed by John C Frank, Grassfire LLC - Transcript order form due 09/17/2021 for Janet Davis. (Court Staff, stbd)
September 3, 2021 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (No Transcripts Needed) See docket entry #83 by Defendant Laramie County Clerk re #71 Notice of Appeal (Attorney). (Young, Catherine) Modified text (Court Staff, stbd). (Main Document 84 replaced with flattened document on 9/7/2021) (Court Staff, stbd).
September 2, 2021 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Transcripts Needed) by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State for proceedings held on 07/19/2021 before Judge Freudenthal, re #73 Notice of Appeal (Attorney). (Williams, Mackenzie)
September 2, 2021 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by court reporter Jan Davis. Transcripts due 9/30/2021. (Davis, Jan)
September 2, 2021 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number CHY035213 re #73 Notice of Appeal (Attorney) filed by Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Court Staff, stmo)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal denying #68 Bill of Costs and granting in part and denying in part #80 Motion to Stay Case. See Order for specific filing deadlines.(Court Staff, sal)
August 25, 2021 Filing 80 Stipulated MOTION to stay case re 67 Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive, #68 BILL OF COSTS filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC, #69 Objection to Bill of Costs filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Klein, Stephen)
August 25, 2021 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number CHY035175 re #71 Notice of Appeal (Attorney) filed by Laramie County Clerk (Court Staff, stmo)
August 23, 2021 Filing 79 Appeal Number 21-8060 received from USCA for #77 Notice of Cross Appeal (Attorney) filed by John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. Docketing statement due 09/07/2021 for John C. Frank and Grassfire LLC. Transcript order form due 09/07/2021 for John C. Frank and Grassfire LLC. Notice of appearance due on 09/07/2021 for Ed Buchanan, John C. Frank, Grassfire LLC, Debra Lee and Leigh Ann Manlove. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 23, 2021 Filing 78 Preliminary Record of appeal sent to USCA and counsel re #77 Notice of Cross Appeal (Attorney) The procedures and appeals forms may be obtained from the U.S. Court of Appeals website: www.ca10.uscourts.gov. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record on Appeal Including Notice of Appeal) (Court Staff, stbd)
August 23, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to #64 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #65 Judgment, by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AWYDC-1984008. (Klein, Stephen)
August 20, 2021 Filing 76 Appeal Number 21-8059 received from USCA for #73 Notice of Appeal (Attorney) filed by Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. Fee is due by 09/03/2021 for Ed Buchanan and Leigh Ann Manlove. Docketing statement due 09/03/2021 for Ed Buchanan and Leigh Ann Manlove. Transcript order form due 09/03/2021 for Ed Buchanan and Leigh Ann Manlove. Notice of appearance due on 09/03/2021 for Ed Buchanan, John C. Frank, Grassfire LLC and Leigh Ann Manlove. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 20, 2021 Filing 75 Appeal Number 21-8058 received from USCA for #71 Notice of Appeal (Attorney) filed by Laramie County Clerk. Fee docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance are due by 09/03/2021 for Debra Lee. Notice of appearance due on 09/03/2021 for John C. Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 20, 2021 Filing 74 Preliminary Record of appeal sent to USCA and counsel re #73 Notice of Appeal (Attorney) The procedures and appeals forms may be obtained from the U.S. Court of Appeals website: www.ca10.uscourts.gov. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record on Appeal Including Notice of Appeal) (Court Staff, stbd)
August 20, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #64 Order & #65 Judgment, filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Peters, James) Modified text on 8/20/2021 (Court Staff, stbd).
August 20, 2021 Filing 72 Preliminary Record of appeal sent to USCA and counsel re #71 Notice of Appeal (Attorney) The procedures and appeals forms may be obtained from the U.S. Court of Appeals website: www.ca10.uscourts.gov. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record on Appeal Including Notice of Appeal) (Court Staff, stbd)
August 20, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #64 Order & #65 Judgment, filed by Defendant Laramie County Clerk. (Young, Catherine) Modified text on 8/20/2021 (Court Staff, stbd).
August 19, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE OF JOINDER in #69 OBJECTION to #68 Bill of Costs filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Peters, James) by Defendant Laramie County Clerk (Young, Catherine)
August 19, 2021 Filing 69 OBJECTION to #68 Bill of Costs filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Peters, James)
August 5, 2021 Filing 68 BILL OF COSTS filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipts) (Klein, Stephen) (Main Document 68 replaced on 8/5/2021) (Court Staff, sal). Modified on 8/27/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
August 4, 2021 Filing 67 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs have until August 26, 2021, to file a motion for attorneys' fees. (Court Staff, sjgc)
August 3, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Deadline for Attorneys' Fees Motion filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Barr, Benjamin)
July 22, 2021 Filing 65 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in part and Defendant in part against Defendant in part and Plaintiff in part. All pending deadlines/hearing dates are vacated.(Court Staff, sal)The AO133 Bill of Cost form is available at https://www.wyd.uscourts.gov/forms/bill-costs.
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting in part and denying in part #41 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part #52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment will be entered accordingly. (Court Staff, sal)
July 22, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #63 Joint MOTION to Vacate Pretrial Deadlines (Court Staff, smxb)
July 21, 2021 Filing 63 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Joint MOTION to Vacate Pretrial Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Klein, Stephen) Modified on 7/22/2021 (Court Staff, smxb).
July 19, 2021 Filing 62 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal: Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2021. Motions taken under advisement. Written Order will be entered. (Court Reporter Jan Davis.) (Court Staff, sal)
July 9, 2021 Filing 61 WITHDRAWL of Attorney Appearance by Casandra A Craven on behalf of John C Frank, Grassfire LLC, Jennifer Horal (Craven, Casandra) Text modified on 7/12/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
July 2, 2021 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Klein, Stephen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth A Johnson on behalf of John C Frank, Grassfire LLC (Johnson, Seth)
June 18, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE OF JOINDER in #56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Peters, James) by Defendant Laramie County Clerk (Stewart, Jon)
June 18, 2021 Filing 57 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re #56 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Peters, James)
June 18, 2021 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Peters, James)
June 18, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE OF JOINDER in #53 MEMORANDUM in Support of #52 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Peters, James), #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment, by Defendant Laramie County Clerk (Stewart, Jon)
June 18, 2021 Filing 54 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re #52 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Peters, James)
June 18, 2021 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Support of #52 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Peters, James)
June 18, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Peters, James)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #40 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff, Grassfire, LLC shall comply with Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production on or before June 14, 2021, and Jenifer Horal shall comply with Defendants' subpoena on or before June 14, 2021. (Court Staff, sjgc)
May 28, 2021 Filing 50 REPLY to #45 Response in Opposition to Motion, #44 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F) (Peters, James)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #47 Motion to Vacate and reset Dispositive Motions Deadlines. Motions filing deadline 6/18/2021. Motion response deadline 7/2/2021. Dispositive Motions Hearing RESET for 7/19/2021 09:00 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. All other deadlines established in the Order on Initial Pretrial Conference shall remain in effect.(Court Staff, sal)
May 25, 2021 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Vacate and Reset Dispositive Motion Deadlines and Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Klein, Stephen)
May 25, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #47 MOTION to Vacate and Reset Dispositive Motion Deadlines and Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Court Staff, sal)
May 24, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Vacate and Reset Dispositive Motion Deadlines and Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peters, James) Unreferred on 5/25/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
May 21, 2021 Filing 46 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Benjamin T Barr on behalf of Jennifer Horal (Barr, Benjamin)
May 21, 2021 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Compel filed by Non Party Jennifer Horal. (Klein, Stephen)
May 21, 2021 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Grassfire LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A) (Klein, Stephen)
May 21, 2021 Filing 43 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Stephen R Klein on behalf of Jennifer Horal (Klein, Stephen)
May 21, 2021 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support of #41 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen R. Klein and Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Affidavit of Jennifer Horal) (Klein, Stephen) 2 discs containing Exhibit 17 and 2 hard copies of Exhibit 13 received on 5/24/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
May 21, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Klein, Stephen)
May 7, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Compel filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Peters, James)
May 6, 2021 Filing 39 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal: Status Conference held on 5/6/2021. (Court Reporter Jan Davis.) (Court Staff, sal)
May 4, 2021 Filing 38 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. On May 4, 2021, the Court held an informal telephonic discovery conference to discuss Plaintiff's objections to Defendant's discovery requests related to efforts to obtain signatures. After hearing from the parties, the Court granted Plaintiff's request to address the issue via formal briefing. Therefore, Defendant may file a motion to compel on or before May 11, 2021. Any response is due fourteen days after the filing of the motion, with any reply due seven days after the response. The parties are to continue to confer and work together to resolve this issue without order of the Court. (Court Staff, sjgc)
April 30, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Hearing: BY TELEPHONE - All parties may appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call: Toll Free 877/336-1829, Access code 3509533#, Join as guest Press #, Security code 2967#. Status Conference RESET for 5/6/2021 08:30 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James LaRock terminated. (Court Staff, smh)
March 30, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James LaRock filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peters, James)
March 29, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Bradley Peters on behalf of Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State (Peters, James)
December 22, 2020 Filing 33 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDERby the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Motions filing deadline 5/28/2021. Motion response deadline 6/11/2021. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 7/13/2021 09:00 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 1/31/2021. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 1/31/2021. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Stipulation Deadline 1/22/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2021 01:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Bench Trial (1 day/#2) set for 8/23/2021 08:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Status Conference set for 5/4/2021 09:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal.(Court Staff, sal)
December 14, 2020 Filing 32 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Klein, Stephen)
November 23, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine M. Young on behalf of Laramie County Clerk (Young, Catherine)
October 15, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2020 01:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
October 15, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (LaRock, James)
October 15, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Laramie County Clerk. (Stewart, Jon)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal denying #16 Motion to Dismiss (Court Staff, sal)
August 31, 2020 Filing 26 OPPOSITION to #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #16 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Barr, Benjamin)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal denying #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Court Staff, sal)
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to #20 Response to Motion filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - 2010 County Clerks Legislative Submission) (Klein, Stephen)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying Request for Hearing on #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Plaintiffs are permitted to file a reply brief in accordance with Local Rule 7.1(b)(2)(C).(Court Staff, sal)
August 18, 2020 Filing 22 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin finding as moot #19 Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive. Defendants' motion requests leave to file a responsive brief that exceeds the ten-page limit by nine pages (19 pages in total). Because this responsive briefing pertains to a dispositive motion, the parties are allowed twenty-five pages of briefing under Local Rule 7.1(b)(2)(B). Therefore this motion is MOOT. (Court Staff, sem)
August 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF JOINDER in #20 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (LaRock, James) by Defendant Laramie County Clerk (Stewart, Jon)
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (LaRock, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Response to Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LaRock, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF JOINDER in #17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (LaRock, James), #16 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Laramie County Clerk (Stewart, Jon)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (LaRock, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State. (LaRock, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Mark Stewart on behalf of Laramie County Clerk (Stewart, Jon)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wyo. Gen Sess. Laws Ch. 80, s 174 (1890), #2 Exhibit B - Casper Star Trib. Mar. 27, 1963 at 18, #3 Exhibit C - 22.1-418, Wyo. Stat. 1957, 1973 Cum. Supp., #4 Exhibit D - Wyo. Stat. 22-26-113 (1984), #5 Exhibit E - Casper Star Trib. Oct. 22, 1988 at 17, #6 Exhibit F - NBC v. Karpan slip op. Oct. 21, 1988, #7 Exhibit G - Wyo. Stat. 22-26-113 (1990), #8 Exhibit H - Casper Star Trib. Mar. 4, 2008 at 13) (Klein, Stephen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Klein, Stephen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grassfire LLC, John C Frank. Laramie County District Attorney served on 7/30/2020, answer due on 8/20/2020 (Klein, Stephen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grassfire LLC, John C Frank. Laramie County Clerk served on 7/30/2020, answer due on 8/20/2020 (Klein, Stephen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grassfire LLC, John C Frank. Wyoming Secretary of State served on 7/30/2020, answer due on 8/20/2020 (Klein, Stephen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James LaRock on behalf of Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State (LaRock, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mackenzie Williams on behalf of Laramie County District Attorney, Wyoming Secretary of State (Williams, Mackenzie)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #5 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Benjamin T Barr for John C Frank and Grassfire LLC and granting #6 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Stephen R Klein for John C Frank and Grassfire LLC. (Court Staff, sal)
July 28, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY - DISREGARD. (Court Staff, sjk).
July 28, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY - DISREGARD (Court Staff, sjk).
July 27, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Stephen Klein. Receipt CHY033360. (Court Staff, sjk)
July 27, 2020 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Benjamin Barr. Receipt CHY033359. (Court Staff, sjk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Steve Klein to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Craven, Casandra) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/28/2020) (Court Staff, sal).
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Benjamin Barr to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Craven, Casandra) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/28/2020) (Court Staff, sal).
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC, 1 issued. (Court Staff, stmo)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC, 1 issued. (Court Staff, stmo)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiffs John C Frank, Grassfire LLC, 1 issued. (Court Staff, stmo)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by John C. Frank and Grassfire LLC. (3 summonses issued) (Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY033351). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Court Staff, stmo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2020: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stmo). Modified on 7/24/2020 (Court Staff, stmo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank et al v. Wyoming Secretary of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Secretary of State
Represented By: Mackenzie Williams
Represented By: James LaRock
Represented By: James Bradley Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramie County District Attorney
Represented By: Mackenzie Williams
Represented By: James LaRock
Represented By: James Bradley Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramie County Clerk
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Represented By: Catherine M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Lee
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Represented By: Catherine M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Ann Manlove
Represented By: Mackenzie Williams
Represented By: James LaRock
Represented By: James Bradley Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Buchanan
Represented By: Mackenzie Williams
Represented By: James LaRock
Represented By: James Bradley Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grassfire LLC
Represented By: Casandra A Craven
Represented By: Stephen R Klein
Represented By: Benjamin T Barr
Represented By: Seth A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Frank
Represented By: Casandra A Craven
Represented By: Stephen R Klein
Represented By: Benjamin T Barr
Represented By: Seth A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Jennifer Horal
Represented By: Stephen R Klein
Represented By: Casandra A Craven
Represented By: Benjamin T Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?