Smith et al v Wyoming Governor et al
Plaintiff: Grace Smith and Renee Buchli
Defendant: Ms Grace Smith, Andy Smith, Shelta Rambur, Tiffany Leimback, Tamara Weaver, Renee Buchi, Carleigh Boucher, Jessica McComb, Bobbi Dockins, Candi Kusler, Laura Pavey, Wyoming Governor, Wyoming Department of Health State Health Officer, Wyoming Department of Health Interim Director, Sheridan County School District No 2 Superintendent, Albany County School District No 1 Superintendent, Laramie County School District No 1 Superintendent, Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent, Sweetwater County School District No 2 Superintendent, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent, Albany County Health Officer, Johnson County Health Officer, Laramie County Health Officer, Goshen County Health Officer, Sweetwater County Health Officer, Mark Gordon, Alexia Harrist, MD, Stefan Johansson, Scott Stults, Craig Dougherty, Sheridan County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Jubal Yennie, Albany County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Dr Margaret Crespo, Laramie County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Ryan Kramer, Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Craig Barringer, Sweetwater County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Damion Smith, Kent Stokes, Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Sheridan Police Department, Jean Allais, MD, Mark Schueler, MD, Stanley Hartman, MD, Ted Church, MD, Jean Stachon, MD, Uinta County School District 4 Superintendent, Alexia Harrist MD, Jean Allais MD and Uinta County School District No 4 Board of Trustees
Petitioner: Families for Healthy Communities
Case Number: 2:2021cv00201
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISMISSING UINTA COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 4 DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CLOSING CASE by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal.(Court Staff, sal)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DISMISSING GOVERNOR GORDON AND COUNTY HEALTH OFFICIALS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. The only defendants now remaining in the case are the Unita County School District No. 4 Defendants. See order for further ruling.(Court Staff, sal)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #55 Motion to Dismiss, #57 Motion to Dismiss, #60 Motion to Dismiss, #62 Motion to Dismiss, #63 Motion to Dismiss, #65 Motion to Dismiss, #67 Motion to Dismiss and #70 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings. See Order for specific ruling and additional deadlines.(Court Staff, sal) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
February 25, 2022 Filing 70 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendants Wyoming Department of Health Interim Director, Wyoming Department of Health State Health Officer. (Engels, Jackson) Modified on 2/25/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal denying #59 Motion for Order affirming the Court's December 22, 2021 Order.(Court Staff, sal)
February 10, 2022 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Support of #67 Motion to Dismiss filed by Intervenor Defendant Families for Healthy Communities. (Zars, Reed)
February 10, 2022 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss #54 Second Amended Complaint filed by Intervenor Defendant Families for Healthy Communities. (Zars, Reed) Modified on 2/11/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
February 10, 2022 Filing 66 BRIEF In Support re #65 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Sweetwater County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sweetwater County School District No 2 Superintendent. (Cowper, Nathan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 65 Second MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss Sweetwater County School District No 2 as a party filed by Defendants Sweetwater County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sweetwater County School District No 2 Superintendent. (Cowper, Nathan). Added MOTION to Dismiss Party on 2/11/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
February 10, 2022 Filing 64 BRIEF In Support re #63 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Laramie County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Laramie County School District No 1 Superintendent. (Coppede, John)
February 10, 2022 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively, Motion to Dismiss Laramie County School District No 1 as a party filed by Defendants Laramie County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Laramie County School District No 1 Superintendent. (Coppede, John) Modified on 2/11/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
February 10, 2022 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss #54 Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Albany County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Albany County School District No 1 Superintendent. (Chaney, L) Modified on 2/11/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
February 10, 2022 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Support of #60 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Wyoming Department of Health Interim Director, Wyoming Department of Health State Health Officer. (Engels, Jackson)
February 10, 2022 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss #54 Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Wyoming Department of Health Interim Director, Wyoming Department of Health State Health Officer. (Engels, Jackson) Modified on 2/11/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
February 10, 2022 Filing 59 MOTION for Order re #23 Order filed by Defendants Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent. (Phillips, Brianne) Modified on 2/11/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
February 10, 2022 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support of #57 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent. (Phillips, Brianne)
February 10, 2022 Filing 57 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Defendants Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent. (Phillips, Brianne)
February 10, 2022 Filing 56 Sheridan County School District 2's BRIEF in Support of #55 Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, and in the alternative, Rule 21 Motion to Drop or Sever Claims Asserted Against Sheridan County School District 2 filed by Defendants Sheridan County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sheridan County School District No 2 Superintendent. (Hoopes, Kendal) Modified on 2/10/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
February 10, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss #54 Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), and in the alternative, Rule 21 MOTION to Drop or Sever Claims Asserted Against Sheridan County School District 2 filed by Defendants Sheridan County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sheridan County School District No 2 Superintendent. (Hoopes, Kendal) Modified on 2/10/2022 (Court Staff, sal). Added MOTION to Bifurcate on 2/11/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
January 27, 2022 Filing 54 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Carleigh Boucher, Candi Kusler, Laura Pavey, Renee Buchli, Shelta Rambur, Bobbi Dockins, Jessica McComb, Tamara Weaver. (Beduhn, Nick) Text and filers modified on 1/31/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
January 27, 2022 Filing 53 FILING ERROR - disregard AMENDED COMPLAINT per court order against Defendant All Defendants with Jury Demand All Defendants., filed by Carleigh Boucher, Candi Kusler, Laura Pavey, Renee Buchli, Shelta Rambur, Bobbi Dockins, Jessica McComb, Tamara Weaver. (Beduhn, Nick) Modified on 1/31/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting in part and denying in part #48 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are permitted to file a Second Amended Complaint by 1/28/22.(Court Staff, sal)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #38 Motion to Intervene. Families for Healthy Communities added as Intervenors. (Court Staff, sal)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting in part and denying in part #43 Motion to Dismiss Albany County School District Defendants. Plaintiffs have until 1/28/22 to file a second amended complaint.(Court Staff, sal)
January 4, 2022 Filing 49 BRIEF in support of #48 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, MOTION TO DISMISS PARTY Sheridan Police Department filed by Defendant Sheridan Police Department. (Goetz, Megan) Text and link modified on 1/5/2022 (Court Staff, sal). Modified text on 1/5/2022 (Court Staff, sjlg).
January 4, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION TO DISMISS pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, MOTION TO DISMISS PARTY Sheridan Police Department filed by Sheridan Police Department. Attorneys Megan Overmann Goetz and Crystal D. Stewart appearing for Sheridan Police Department. (Goetz, Megan) Text modified on 1/5/2022 (Court Staff, sal). Motion relief added and text modified on 1/5/2022 (Court Staff, sjlg).
December 30, 2021 Filing 47 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #43 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Carleigh Boucher, Renee Buchli, Bobbi Dockins, Candi Kusler, Tiffany Leimback, Jessica McComb, Laura Pavey, Shelta Rambur, Andy Smith, Grace Smith, Tamara Weaver, Movant Families for Healthy Communities. (Beduhn, Nick) Modified on 1/3/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #13 Motion to Dismiss, #15 Motion to Dismiss Case, #23 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #26 Motion to Dismiss, #34 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #44 Motion to Dismiss, #45 Motion to Dismiss Case and denying #11 Motion to Dismiss. Multiple parties terminated. See Order for specifics.(Court Staff, sal)
December 20, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Case, filed by Defendants Wyoming Department of Health Interim Director, Wyoming Department of Health State Health Officer. (Engels, Jackson)
December 20, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 attorney Megan Overmann Goetz and Crystal D. Stewart appearing for Sheridan Police Department, filed by Defendant Sheridan Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goetz, Megan)
December 16, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Party Superintendent Jubal Yennie and Trustees of Albany County School District #1 filed by Defendants Albany County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Albany County School District No 1 Superintendent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chaney, L)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to #9 Motion to Dismiss. Motion response deadline 12/17/2021.(Court Staff, sal)
December 10, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #41 First MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response to Motion (Court Staff, sal)
December 9, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. First MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response to Motion filed by Plaintiffs Carleigh Boucher, Renee Buchli, Bobbi Dockins, Candi Kusler, Tiffany Leimback, Jessica McComb, Laura Pavey, Shelta Rambur, Andy Smith, Grace Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beduhn, Nick) Unreferred on 12/10/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
December 9, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan Hayes on behalf of Families for Healthy Communities (Hayes, Megan)
December 9, 2021 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support of #38 Motion to Intervene filed by Intervenor Respondent Families for Healthy Communities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Zars, Reed)
December 9, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene, attorney Reed Zars appearing for Families for Healthy Communities, filed by Intervenor Respondent Families for Healthy Communities. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zars, Reed)
December 9, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy J Copenhaver on behalf of Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent (Copenhaver, Tracy)
December 8, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott E Kolpitcke on behalf of Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent, Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent (Kolpitcke, Scott)
December 7, 2021 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support of #34 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent. (Phillips, Brianne)
December 7, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Defendants Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent. (Phillips, Brianne)
December 5, 2021 Filing 33 DUPLICATE PLEADING - see #30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy J Copenhaver on behalf of Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent (Copenhaver, Tracy) Modified on 12/6/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
December 5, 2021 Filing 32 FILED INCORRECTLY - will need to be refiled by counsel NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy J Copenhaver on behalf of Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent (Copenhaver, Tracy) Modified on 12/6/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
December 5, 2021 Filing 31 FILED INCORRECTLY - will need to be refiled by counsel. NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy J Copenhaver on behalf of Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent (Copenhaver, Tracy) Modified on 12/6/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
December 5, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy J Copenhaver on behalf of Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent (Copenhaver, Tracy)
December 5, 2021 Filing 29 FILED INCORRECTLY - will need to be refiled by counsel. NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy J Copenhaver on behalf of Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent (Copenhaver, Tracy) Modified on 12/6/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
December 5, 2021 Filing 28 FILED INCORRECTLY - will need to be re-filed by counsel. NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy J Copenhaver on behalf of Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent (Copenhaver, Tracy) Modified on 12/6/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
December 2, 2021 Filing 27 BRIEF in Support re #26 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Sweetwater County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sweetwater County School District No 2 Superintendent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Cowper, Nathan)
December 2, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Sweetwater County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sweetwater County School District No 2 Superintendent. (Cowper, Nathan)
December 2, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Robert Cowper on behalf of Sweetwater County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sweetwater County School District No 2 Superintendent (Cowper, Nathan)
December 2, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard D Bush on behalf of Sweetwater County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sweetwater County School District No 2 Superintendent (Bush, Richard)
December 2, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted attorney Brianne C. Phillips appearing for Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent, filed by Defendants Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent. (Phillips, Brianne)
December 1, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of #23 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent. (Phillips, Brianne) Modified on 12/2/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
December 1, 2021 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - disregard. First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, attorney Brianne C. Phillips appearing for Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent, filed by Defendants Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees, Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent. (Phillips, Brianne) Modified on 12/2/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
December 1, 2021 Filing 20 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. The unopposed oral motion for extension of the Albany County School District No. 1 Superintendent and Board of Trustees deadline to file a responsive pleading to the amended complaint to and including December 16, 2021 is GRANTED. (Court Staff, sal) Text modified on 12/6/2021 (Court Staff, sal).
December 1, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John W Fairless on behalf of Albany County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Albany County School District No 1 Superintendent (Fairless, John)
December 1, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jackson Matthew Engels on behalf of Wyoming Department of Health Interim Director, Wyoming Department of Health State Health Officer (Engels, Jackson)
November 30, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Wyoming Department of Health Interim Director, Wyoming Department of Health State Health Officer. (Schelhaas, Ryan)
November 30, 2021 Filing 16 BRIEF In Support re #13 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Laramie County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Laramie County School District No 1 Superintendent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Coppede, John)
November 30, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case, filed by Defendants Wyoming Department of Health Interim Director, Wyoming Department of Health State Health Officer. (Schelhaas, Ryan)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan T Schelhaas on behalf of Wyoming Department of Health Interim Director, Wyoming Department of Health State Health Officer (Schelhaas, Ryan)
November 30, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), or alternatively Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 filed by Defendants Laramie County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Laramie County School District No 1 Superintendent. (Coppede, John)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A Coppede on behalf of Laramie County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Laramie County School District No 1 Superintendent (Coppede, John)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(5) attorney Megan Overmann Goetz and Crystal D. Stewart appearing for Sheridan Police Department, filed by Defendant Sheridan Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goetz, Megan)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal terminating #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. As Plaintiffs did not file any returns per the order on LR 4.1 (ECF No. 7), it appears that the docketing of the amended complaint as a combined pleading and motion was a clerical error by the court. As such, the #4 Motion for preliminary injunction is terminated without prejudice to Plaintiffs filing a properly briefed motion under Rule 65. (Court Staff, sal)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants Sheridan County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sheridan County School District No 2 Superintendent. (Hoopes, Kendal)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of complexity by Defendants Sheridan County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sheridan County School District No 2 Superintendent ; this case is non-complex. (Hoopes, Kendal)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. By November 23, 2021, Plaintiffs shall comply with Local Rule 4.1(b) requiring the return of service contemporaneously with the filing of any motions and in no event not later than the time within which the party served must respond. (Court Staff, sal)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kendal Royce Hoopes on behalf of Sheridan County School District No 2 Board of Trustees, Sheridan County School District No 2 Superintendent (Hoopes, Kendal)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by L Kathleen Chaney on behalf of Albany County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Albany County School District No 1 Superintendent (Chaney, L)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Judgment and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants filed by Laura Pavey, Carleigh Boucher, Andy Smith, Grace Smith, Renee Buchli, Shelta Rambur, Bobbi Dockins, Jessica McComb, Tiffany Leimback, Candi Kusler, Tamara Weaver (Court Staff, sbh) Modified into pending motion on 11/9/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal with a referral to Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, stmo)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses (9) Issued (Court Staff, stmo)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties with 12. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number AWYDC-2020398)Attorney Nick Edward Beduhn added to party Grace Smith(pty:dft), filed by Grace Smith. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Affidavit, #16 Affidavit, #17 Affidavit, #18 Appendix, #19 Affidavit, #20 Affidavit, #21 Affidavit) (Beduhn, Nick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v Wyoming Governor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Grace Smith
Represented By: Nick Edward Beduhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelta Rambur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Leimback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Buchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carleigh Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica McComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbi Dockins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candi Kusler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Pavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Department of Health State Health Officer
Represented By: Jackson Matthew Engels
Represented By: Ryan T Schelhaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Department of Health Interim Director
Represented By: Jackson Matthew Engels
Represented By: Ryan T Schelhaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheridan County School District No 2 Superintendent
Represented By: Kendal Royce Hoopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany County School District No 1 Superintendent
Represented By: L Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: John W Fairless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramie County School District No 1 Superintendent
Represented By: John A Coppede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goshen County School District No 1 Superintendent
Represented By: Scott E Kolpitcke
Represented By: Tracy J Copenhaver
Represented By: Brianne C Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater County School District No 2 Superintendent
Represented By: Nathan Robert Cowper
Represented By: Richard D Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uinta County School District No 6 Superintendent
Represented By: Brianne C Phillips
Represented By: Scott E Kolpitcke
Represented By: Tracy J Copenhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany County Health Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County Health Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramie County Health Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goshen County Health Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater County Health Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexia Harrist, MD
Represented By: Jackson Matthew Engels
Represented By: Ryan T Schelhaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan Johansson
Represented By: Jackson Matthew Engels
Represented By: Ryan T Schelhaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Stults
Represented By: Kendal Royce Hoopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Dougherty
Represented By: Kendal Royce Hoopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheridan County School District No 2 Board of Trustees
Represented By: Kendal Royce Hoopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jubal Yennie
Represented By: L Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: John W Fairless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany County School District No 1 Board of Trustees
Represented By: L Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: John W Fairless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Margaret Crespo
Represented By: John A Coppede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramie County School District No 1 Board of Trustees
Represented By: John A Coppede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Kramer
Represented By: Scott E Kolpitcke
Represented By: Tracy J Copenhaver
Represented By: Brianne C Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goshen County School District No 1 Board of Trustees
Represented By: Scott E Kolpitcke
Represented By: Tracy J Copenhaver
Represented By: Brianne C Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Barringer
Represented By: Nathan Robert Cowper
Represented By: Richard D Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater County School District No 2 Board of Trustees
Represented By: Nathan Robert Cowper
Represented By: Richard D Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damion Smith
Represented By: Brianne C Phillips
Represented By: Scott E Kolpitcke
Represented By: Tracy J Copenhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Stokes
Represented By: Brianne C Phillips
Represented By: Scott E Kolpitcke
Represented By: Tracy J Copenhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uinta County School District No 6 Board of Trustees
Represented By: Brianne C Phillips
Represented By: Scott E Kolpitcke
Represented By: Tracy J Copenhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheridan Police Department
Represented By: Megan Overmann Goetz
Represented By: Crystal Dawn Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Allais, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Schueler, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Hartman, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Church, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Stachon, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uinta County School District 4 Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexia Harrist MD
Represented By: Jackson Matthew Engels
Represented By: Ryan T Schelhaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Allais MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uinta County School District No 4 Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Smith
Represented By: Nick Edward Beduhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Buchli
Represented By: Nick Edward Beduhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Families for Healthy Communities
Represented By: Megan Hayes
Represented By: Reed Zars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?