Iron Bar Holdings LLC v. Cape et al
Plaintiff: Iron Bar Holdings LLC
Defendant: Bradley H Cape, Zachary M Smith, Phillip G Yeomans and John W Slowensky
Petitioner: Backcountry Hunters & Anglers
Case Number: 2:2022cv00067
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl denying #13 Motion to Remand (Court Staff, scat)
May 6, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive) amicus curiae brief filed by Movant Backcountry Hunters & Anglers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed amicus curiae brief)(Hanson, Eric)
May 6, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Eric B Hanson on behalf of Backcountry Hunters & Anglers Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2099019. (Hanson, Eric) Modified text to correct movant on 5/6/2022 (Court Staff, stbd). (Main Document 20 replaced on 5/10/2022 to flatten document) (Court Staff, skb).
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #18 MOTION for Eric Hanson to appear pro hac vice; filed by Backcountry Hunters & Anglers. (cc: Counsel via email)(Court Staff, stbd) Modified text to correct movant on 5/6/2022 (Court Staff, stbd).
May 6, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Eric Hanson to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movant Backcountry Hunters & Anglers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Eric Hanson, #2 Proposed Order)(Schenk, Trevor) Modified text to correct movant on 5/6/2022 (Court Staff, stbd).
May 2, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Plaintiff Iron Bar Holdings LLC. (Weisz, M)
April 28, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Bradley H Cape, John W Slowensky, Zachary M Smith, Phillip G Yeomans. (Semerad, Ryan)
April 18, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Bradley H Cape, John W Slowensky, Zachary M Smith, Phillip G Yeomans. (Semerad, Ryan)
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Iron Bar Holdings LLC. (Weisz, M)
April 14, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Iron Bar Holdings LLC. (Weisz, M)
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Iron Bar Holdings LLC. (Weisz, M)
April 6, 2022 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney),, filed by Defendants Bradley H Cape, John W Slowensky, Zachary M Smith, Phillip G Yeomans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Semerad, Ryan)
April 5, 2022 Filing 10 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed in Second Judicial District Court on 3/2/2022 by All Defendants. (Court Staff, stbd) Modified text to correct date of filing on 4/5/2022 (Court Staff, stbd).
April 5, 2022 Filing 9 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Court Staff, stbd)
April 4, 2022 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet Docket Sheet and all filings) (Semerad, Ryan)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON REMOVAL by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. See Order for details. (Copy of Order sent to Clerk of Second Judicial District Court, Carbon County via U.S. mail). (Court Staff, skb)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl as Presiding Judge and the Honorable Kelly H Rankin as Referral Judge for all further proceedings by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, sjlg)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Bradley H Cape, John W Slowensky, Zachary M Smith, Phillip G Yeomans. (Semerad, Ryan)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Bradley H Cape, John W Slowensky, Zachary M Smith, Phillip G Yeomans. (Semerad, Ryan)
March 22, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Presiding Judge). (Court Staff, stbd)
March 22, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed 2/15/2022 filed by Iron Bar Holdings LLC. (Court Staff, stbd)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second Judicial District - Carbon County, Wyoming, Civil Act. No. 22-34. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWYDC-2078664), filed by Phillip G Yeomans, Bradley H Cape, Zachary M Smith, John W Slowensky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 State Court Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Semerad, Ryan) (Attachment 5 replaced with flattened document 3/22/2022) (Court Staff, stbd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2022: #6 Order on Removal) (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iron Bar Holdings LLC v. Cape et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Bar Holdings LLC
Represented By: M Gregory Weisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley H Cape
Represented By: Ryan A Semerad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary M Smith
Represented By: Ryan A Semerad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip G Yeomans
Represented By: Ryan A Semerad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Slowensky
Represented By: Ryan A Semerad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Backcountry Hunters & Anglers
Represented By: Eric B Hanson
Represented By: Patrick Lewallen
Represented By: Trevor James Schenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?