Wessenberg et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming et al
Plaintiff: Richard Wessenberg and Theresa Wessenberg
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Administrators and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Fiduciaries
Case Number: 2:2022cv00162
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #10 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Plaintiffs Richard Wessenberg, Theresa Wessenberg. (Asay, Gregory)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time Plaintiffs shall have up to and including September 23, 2022 to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss.(Court Staff, sjdl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) to Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Richard Wessenberg, Theresa Wessenberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asay, Gregory) Modified text on 9/12/2022 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 30, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Administrators, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Fiduciaries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C) (Buckley, Lucas)
August 30, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Administrators, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Fiduciaries. (Buckley, Lucas)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have up to and including September 6, 2022, within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint.(Court Staff, sag)
August 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Amended MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Administrators, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Fiduciaries. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buckley, Lucas)
August 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JoAnna S DeWald on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Administrators, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Fiduciaries (DeWald, JoAnna)
August 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Administrators, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Fiduciaries (Buckley, Lucas)
August 24, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Administrators, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Fiduciaries. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buckley, Lucas) Modified to terminate motion per amended motion #8 on 8/25/2022 (Court Staff, smxb).
August 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JoAnna S DeWald on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Administrators, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Fiduciaries (DeWald, JoAnna)
August 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Administrators, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Fiduciaries (Buckley, Lucas)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiffs Richard Wessenberg, Theresa Wessenberg. (Court Staff, sal)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (4 summons(es) issued) (Filing fee ($402) - receipt #2-91) filed by Theresa Wessenberg, Richard Wessenberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sal) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/28/2022) (Court Staff, stmo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wessenberg et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wessenberg
Represented By: Bruce S Asay
Represented By: Gregory Bruce Asay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Wessenberg
Represented By: Bruce S Asay
Represented By: Gregory Bruce Asay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming
Represented By: JoAnna S DeWald
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance
Represented By: JoAnna S DeWald
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Administrators
Represented By: JoAnna S DeWald
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming Active and Retired Employees Wyoming Access Retiree Health Insurance Coverage Corporate Policy 22 Retiree Application for Group Health Insurance Plan Fiduciaries
Represented By: JoAnna S DeWald
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?