Christian v. Loyakk Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Nathan Christian and Nathan Christian
Defendant: Loyakk Inc., Loyakk Ltd., Sadiq Quasim, Salim Ali, Loyakk Inc and Loyakk Ltd
Case Number: 2:2022cv00215
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPPOSITION to #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, filed by Plaintiff Nathan Christian. (Cornish, Robert)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPPOSITION to #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, filed by Plaintiff Nathan Christian. (Cornish, Robert)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D. Scott Slawson on behalf of Salim Ali, Loyakk Inc (Slawson, D.)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and other bases filed by Defendant Sadiq Quasim. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and other bases, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Defendant Sadiq Quasim in Support of Motion)(Gottesman, Baruch)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Baruch Gottesman on behalf of Sadiq Quasim (Gottesman, Baruch)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #14 MOTION for Baruch S. Gottesman to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Sadiq Quasim (order emailed to PHV counsel). (Court Staff, stmo)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR BARUCH S GOTTESMAN. RECEIPT 2-737. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Baruch S. Gottesman to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Sadiq Quasim. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Brennan, Christopher)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gay Vanderpoel Woodhouse on behalf of Sadiq Quasim (Woodhouse, Gay)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher M Brennan on behalf of Sadiq Quasim (Brennan, Christopher)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE by the Senior District Judge Nancy D Freudenthal. Status Report due by 12/9/2022.(Court Staff, sal)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Crystal J. McDonough re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, attorney Crystal J. McDonough appearing for Loyakk Inc,, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, attorney Crystal J. McDonough appearing for Salim Ali, Certificate of Mailing filed by Defendants Salim Ali, Loyakk Inc, Sadiq Quasim. (McDonough, Crystal)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, attorney Crystal J. McDonough appearing for Loyakk Inc, filed by Defendant Loyakk Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Advisor Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit in Support, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - iStrategies-Loyakk Reseller Partnership, #5 Affidavit McDonough Affirmation ISO Loyakk Inc Motion to Dismiss, #6 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(McDonough, Crystal)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, attorney Crystal J. McDonough appearing for Salim Ali, filed by Defendant Salim Ali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Advisor Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit ISO M to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Etherium Price from June 14, 2018 - through September 14, 2022, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Etherium Price from November 2, 2018 - through February 2, 2019, #6 Affidavit McDonough Affidavit ISO M to Dismiss Complaint by Salim Ali, #7 Notice of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Ali)(McDonough, Crystal)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Sadiq Quasim answer due 11/30/2022 (Court Staff, sal)
November 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant Sadiq Quasim by Nathan Christian. Answer due 11/30/22. (Cornish, Robert) Text modified on 11/7/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION re #5 Acceptance of Service, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings by Nathan Christian. (Cornish, Robert)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Salim Ali answerdue 11/4/2022; Loyakk Inc answerdue 11/4/2022 (Court Staff, sal)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Nathan Christian. Salim Ali served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022; Loyakk Inc served on 10/14/2022, answer due 11/4/2022. (Cornish, Robert) Modified on 10/28/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summonses (4) Issued (Court Staff, sal)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal (presiding) and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (referral). (Court Staff, sal)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRAECIPE FOR SUMMONS by Plaintiff Nathan Christian (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Cornish, Robert) Modified event on 10/7/2022 (Court Staff, sal).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number AWYDC-2167936) Attorney Robert Vaughan Cornish, Jr added to party Nathan Christian(pty:pla), filed by Nathan Christian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (Cornish, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian v. Loyakk Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Nathan Christian
Represented By: Robert Vaughan Cornish, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Christian
Represented By: Robert Vaughan Cornish, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyakk Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyakk Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadiq Quasim
Represented By: Baruch Gottesman
Represented By: Christopher M Brennan
Represented By: Gay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salim Ali
Represented By: Crystal J McDonough
Represented By: D. Scott Slawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyakk Inc
Represented By: Crystal J McDonough
Represented By: D. Scott Slawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyakk Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?