Mather v. Cody Regional Health Center Inc Physician et al
Plaintiff: Natalie A Mather
Defendant: MD Stephanie Knodel, RN Gena, RN Megan Maus, Connie Zierke, Cody Regional Health Center Inc, Cody Regional Health Center Inc Physician, Cody Regional Health Center Inc Registered Nurse, Cody Regional Health Care Inc Nursing Supervisor, Cody Regional Health Center Inc Human Resource Officer, Stephanie Knodel, Gena and Megan Maus
Case Number: 2:2022cv00223
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Unclaimed. Mail sent to Natalie A. Mather re #6 Order denying without prejudice 5 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense. (Court Staff, skb)
December 16, 2022 Filing 14 Docket entry #4 Mail sent to Natalie A. Mather Returned as Unclaimed. (Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 12/20/2022 (Court Staff, skb).
December 9, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natalie A Mather. Cody Regional Health Center Inc Registered Nurse served on 12/9/2022, answer due on 12/30/2022 (Court Staff, sal)
December 9, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natalie A Mather. Cody Regional Health Care Inc Nursing Supervisor served on 12/9/2022, answer due on 12/30/2022 (Court Staff, sal)
December 9, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natalie A Mather. Cody Regional Health Center Inc Physician served on 12/9/2022, answer due on 12/30/2022 (Court Staff, sal)
December 9, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natalie A Mather. Cody Regional Health Center Inc served on 12/9/2022, answer due on 12/30/2022 (Court Staff, sal)
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 Summonses Issued. (Court Staff, skb)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SERVICE by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl re #7 Motion Sufficing Serving Information and Addresses. (Copy of Order sent to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail and USMS via email.) (Court Staff, skb)
December 5, 2022 Motions No Longer Referred: #7 MOTION for Order Sufficing Serving Information and Addresses. (Court Staff, skb)
November 28, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION Sufficing Serving Information and Addresses filed by Plaintiff Natalie A Mather. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope) (Court Staff, skb) Modified to unrefer motion on 12/5/2022 (Court Staff, skb).
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl denying without prejudice #5 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense. It is ORDERED that in order to administer service on the Defendants, Plaintiff shall provide the Court each of the remaining Defendants' addresses no later than December 2, 2022, or this matter will be dismissed without prejudice. (See ECF No. #4 .) Upon timely receipt, the Clerk of the Court shall immediately serve the complaint and a waiver of service or a summons on the remaining named Defendants pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d). (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail) (Court Staff, skb)
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Direct Service of Process filed by Plaintiff Natalie A Mather. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (Court Staff, skb)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DISMISSING CASE IN PART PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See Order for details. (Copy of Order sent to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail) (Court Staff, skb) Modified text on 11/2/2022 (Court Staff, skb).
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott W Skavdahl and Honorable Kelly H Rankin as Referral Judge for all further proceedings; by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, smxb)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Natalie A Mather. (Court Staff, sal)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no summonses issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($402) not paid) filed by Natalie A Mather. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 cover letter and envelope, #3 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mather v. Cody Regional Health Center Inc Physician et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie A Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Stephanie Knodel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Gena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Megan Maus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Zierke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Regional Health Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Regional Health Center Inc Physician
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Regional Health Center Inc Registered Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Regional Health Care Inc Nursing Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Regional Health Center Inc Human Resource Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Knodel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Maus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?