Hickle v. Devon Energy Production Company LP
Plaintiff: Susan E Hickle
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Case Number: 2:2022cv00225
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Filing 22 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 3/17/2023. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 4/17/2023. Discovery due by 5/17/2023. Motions filing deadline 6/16/2023. Motion response deadline 6/30/2023. Replies due by 7/7/2023. Joint Final Pretrial Memorandum due by 8/4/2023. Motion in Limine deadline 8/4/2023. Motions in Limine Response Deadline 8/18/2023. Motions in Limine Reply Deadline 8/25/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2023 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. 2-3 day Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 01:30 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. (Court Staff, sbh)
December 1, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B. Johnson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/1/2022 (Court Reporter: Melanie Sonntag) (Court Staff, sbh)
November 23, 2022 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Plaintiff Susan E Hickle, Counter Defendant Susan E Hickle. (Hendrickson, James)
November 18, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #13 Counterclaim by Susan E Hickle. (Hendrickson, James) Modified text on 11/18/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 8, 2022 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP identifying Other Affiliates Devon Energy Corporation, DVN Operating Company LLC, Devon OEI Operating LLC, Devon OEI Holdings LLC, Devon Energy Corporation (Oklahoma) for Devon Energy Production Company LP (Pope, Jeffrey) Modified text on 11/9/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2022 at 9:30 AM VIA ZOOM before Honorable Alan B Johnson. NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. ***(Court Staff, ssw)
November 2, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw)
November 2, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan E Hickle. Served on Process Server 10/6/2022. (Court Staff, sbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2022: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Court Staff, sbh).
November 2, 2022 Filing 14 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Court Staff, sbh)
November 1, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand to #2 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Susan E Hickle by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Shepherd, John) Modified on 11/2/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 1, 2022 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record) (Shepherd, John) Modified text on 11/2/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Utsarga Bhattarai on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Bhattarai, Utsarga)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Kristina R Van Bockern on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Van Bockern, Kristina)
October 28, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by John F Shepherd on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Shepherd, John)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #7 Amended MOTION for John F. Shepherd, Kristina R. Van Bockern and Utsarga Bhattarai to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Devon Energy Production Company LP (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
October 28, 2022 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $300 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEES FOR JOHN F SHEPHERD, KRISTINA R VAN BOCKERN, & UTSARGA BHATTARAI. RECEIPT 2-570. (Court Staff, sjk)
October 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Amended MOTION for Shepherd, Van Bockern, Bhattarai to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John F. Shepherd, #2 Affidavit Kristina R. Van Bockern, #3 Affidavit Utsarga Bhattarai, #4 Proposed Order) (Pope, Jeffrey) Modified text on 10/28/2022 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 27, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Pope on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Pope, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin denying #4 MOTION for Shepherd, Van Bockern, Bhattarai to appear pro hac vice for failure to comply with Local Rule. Local counsel shall file an Amended Motion along with the Affidavits. (Court Staff, sbh)
October 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Shepherd, Van Bockern, Bhattarai to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John F. Shepherd, #2 Affidavit Kristina R. Van Bockern, #3 Affidavit Utsarga Bhattarai, #4 Proposed Order)(Pope, Jeffrey) (Attachment 2 and 3 replaced with flattened PDFs on 10/27/2022) (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text on 10/27/2022 (Court Staff, stmo).
October 27, 2022 Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment - filed by Defendant Devon Energy Production Company LP. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AWYDC-2178516. (Pope, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. The removing party shall file the state court record and docket sheet within 10 days. (Certified order mailed to state court on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed 9/22/2022 by Susan E Hickle. (Court Staff, smxb)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District - Converse County, 18620 filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Counsel - payment is due within three calendar days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2120 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Successor Trustee, #4 Exhibit D - McDaniel Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Notice, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, smxb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickle v. Devon Energy Production Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan E Hickle
Represented By: Dan B Riggs
Represented By: James Kyle Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Pope
Represented By: John F Shepherd
Represented By: Kristina R Van Bockern
Represented By: Utsarga Bhattarai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?