Ireland et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Brandon Ireland, Meagan Ireland, Brandon Ireland (Parent) and Meagan Ireland (Parent)
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00249
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Hambrick
Referring Judge: Alan B Johnson
2 Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: $100 PHV FEE PAID (RECEIPT #2-1017) on behalf of C. Megan Fischer (Court Staff, stmo)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Hambrick granting #13 MOTION for C. Megan Fischer to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
January 20, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Stephanie A Hambrick. MOTION for C. Megan Fischer to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Patrick)
January 19, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Plaintiffs Brandon Ireland, Meagan Ireland, Brandon Ireland (Parent), Meagan Ireland (Parent). (Krause, Robert)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2023 at 9:30 AM before Honorable Alan B Johnson.NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** (Court Staff, ssw)
January 10, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw)
January 6, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent as FCA North America Holdings LLC; Other Affiliates FCA Foreign Sales Holdco Ltd, SFS UK 1 Limited and Stellantis N.V. (FKA Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.) for FCA US LLC. (Murphy, Patrick) Modified corporate data and text on 1/9/2023 (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text on 1/10/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by FCA US LLC. (Murphy, Patrick) Modified link and text on 1/6/2023 (Court Staff, stmo).
January 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick J Murphy on behalf of FCA US LLC (Murphy, Patrick)
December 14, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meagan Ireland, Meagan Ireland (Parent), Brandon Ireland (Parent), Brandon Ireland. FCA US LLC served on 12/5/2022, answer due on 12/26/2022 (Krause, Robert)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Honorable Kelly H Rankin recused. Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick for all further non-dispositive referral matters. (Court Staff, szf)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, stbd)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert A Krause on behalf of Brandon Ireland, Meagan Ireland, Meagan Ireland (Parent), Brandon Ireland (Parent). (Court Staff, stbd) Modified filers and text on 12/2/2022 (Court Staff, sjlg).
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 Disregard document - Incorrect Attachment - Replaced on 11/30/2022. Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Presiding Judge) and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Referral Judge.) (Court Staff, stbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2022: #1 Corrected Consent) (Court Staff, stbd).
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against FCA US LLC filed by Meagan Ireland, Brandon Ireland, Meagan Ireland (Parent), Brandon Ireland (Parent). (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number AWYDC-2190885) (Krause, Robert) Modified text on 11/29/2022 (Court Staff, stbd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stbd). Modified text and filers on 12/2/2022 (Court Staff, sjlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ireland et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Ireland
Represented By: Larissa Ann McCalla
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Richards
Represented By: Robert A Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan Ireland
Represented By: Larissa Ann McCalla
Represented By: Robert A Krause
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Ireland (Parent)
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Richards
Represented By: Larissa Ann McCalla
Represented By: Robert A Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan Ireland (Parent)
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Richards
Represented By: Larissa Ann McCalla
Represented By: Robert A Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?