Albany County Conservancy et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management Field Manager Rawlins Field Office et al
Petitioner: Albany County Conservancy and J Michael Lockhart
Respondent: United States Bureau of Land Management Field Manager Rawlins Field Office, United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Department of Interior Secretary, Timothy Novotny, Tracy Stone-Manning and Deb Haaland
Intervenor: Rock Creek Wind LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00134
Filed: July 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #17 Motion to Intervene. Movant Rock Creek Wind LLC may permissively intervene as an intervenor respondent. (Court Staff, sjdl)
September 11, 2023 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Rock Creek Wind LLC. (Reimer, Hadassah)
September 11, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Rock Creek Wind LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Reimer, Hadassah)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. The administrative record in this matter shall be due within 90 days of proper service. See order for briefing deadlines. (Court Staff, sbh)
August 14, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albany County Conservancy, J Michael Lockhart. United States Bureau of Land Management Director served on 8/7/2023, answer due on 10/6/2023; United States Bureau of Land Management Field Manager Rawlins Field Office served on 8/7/2023, answer due on 10/6/2023; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 8/7/2023, answer due on 10/6/2023. (Court Staff, sjlg)
August 14, 2023 Filing 14 PLEADING FILED IN ERROR. REFILED AS #15 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Petitioners Albany County Conservancy, J Michael Lockhart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Arnold, Matthew) Modified text on 8/15/2023 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 14, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Matthew R Arnold on behalf of Albany County Conservancy, J Michael Lockhart (Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2297458) (Arnold, Matthew)
August 10, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rudat on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management Field Manager Rawlins Field Office, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Rudat, Amanda)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #10 MOTION for Amanda K. Rudat to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management Field Manager Rawlins Field Office, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
August 9, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Amanda K. Rudat to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Respondents United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management Field Manager Rawlins Field Office, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Amanda Rudat Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Peters, Jasmine)
August 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jasmine M Peters on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management Director, United States Bureau of Land Management Field Manager Rawlins Field Office, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Peters, Jasmine)
August 3, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L Lewis on behalf of Albany County Conservancy, J Michael Lockhart (Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2292957) (Lewis, Elizabeth)
August 2, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by William S Eubanks, II on behalf of Albany County Conservancy, J Michael Lockhart (Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2292153) (Eubanks, William)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #3 MOTION for William S. Eubanks II, Elizabeth L. Lewis and Matthew R. Arnold to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Petitioners J Michael Lockhart, Albany County Conservancy (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
August 1, 2023 REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: #3 MOTION for William S. Eubanks II, Elizabeth L. Lewis, and Matthew R. Arnold to appear pro hac vice (Court Staff, sbh)
July 31, 2023 Filing 5 Summonses Issued. (Court Staff, skb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2023: #1 Summons Issued for U.S. Attorney) (Court Staff, skb).
July 31, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Alan B. Johnson with a referral to Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, skb)
July 28, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for William S. Eubanks II, Elizabeth L. Lewis, and Matthew R. Arnold to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioners Albany County Conservancy, J Michael Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Semerad, Ryan) Modified text on 8/1/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
July 28, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Albany County Conservancy (Semerad, Ryan)
July 28, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW filed by Albany County Conservancy, J Michael Lockhart (Filing fee $402 receipt #AWYDC-22903490) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Semerad, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albany County Conservancy et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management Field Manager Rawlins Field Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Bureau of Land Management Field Manager Rawlins Field Office
Represented By: Amanda Rudat
Represented By: Jasmine M Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Bureau of Land Management Director
Represented By: Amanda Rudat
Represented By: Jasmine M Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Interior Secretary
Represented By: Amanda Rudat
Represented By: Jasmine M Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Novotny
Represented By: Amanda Rudat
Represented By: Jasmine M Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tracy Stone-Manning
Represented By: Amanda Rudat
Represented By: Jasmine M Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Jasmine M Peters
Represented By: Amanda Rudat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Albany County Conservancy
Represented By: Ryan A Semerad
Represented By: William S Eubanks, II
Represented By: Elizabeth L Lewis
Represented By: Matthew R Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J Michael Lockhart
Represented By: Ryan A Semerad
Represented By: William S Eubanks, II
Represented By: Elizabeth L Lewis
Represented By: Matthew R Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Rock Creek Wind LLC
Represented By: Hadassah Marie Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?