AiShang You Limited et al v. Guo et al
Plaintiff: AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu and Yanqin Chen
Defendant: Biming Guo, Grace Li, Ning Qin, Yuxing Ye, Hechun Wei, Che Kean Tat, Annie Huang, Globex Transfer LLC and Kean Tat Che
Petitioner: WeTrade Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00178
Filed: September 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 10/17/2023 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Melanie Sonntag, phone (307) 433-2169 or email MelanieSonntagCRR@gmail.com. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction. Notice of Intent to Redact due 11/13/2023. Notice of Redaction Request due 11/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2024. (Humphrey-Sonntag, Melanie)
October 20, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: $100 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID on behalf of John J. Elliott and Michael H. Ference (total amount received $200 Receipt #2-2209) (Court Staff, stmo)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Dismissing Case pursuant to Rule 41 by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice. Case closed. (Court Staff, sbh)
October 17, 2023 Filing 38 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B. Johnson: Status Conference held on 10/17/2023 (Court Reporter: Melanie Sonntag) (Court Staff, sbh)
October 13, 2023 Filing 37 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Angus Ni on behalf of Kean Tat Che (Ni, Angus)
October 13, 2023 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support of #35 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Kean Tat Che. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kean Tat Che In Support Of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit of Angus F. Ni In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Angus F. Ni) (Ni, Angus) (Attachment 3 flattened and replaced on 10/16/2023) (Court Staff, stmo). Modified text on 10/16/2023 (Court Staff, stmo).
October 13, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Kean Tat Che. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ni, Angus) Modified text on 10/16/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 13, 2023 Filing 34 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Serena Yang on behalf of Kean Tat Che (Yang, Serena)
October 13, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tara Brooke Nethercott on behalf of Kean Tat Che (Nethercott, Tara)
October 12, 2023 Filing 32 REPLY to #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Fengzhen Ai, AiShang You Limited, Yanqin Chen, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Min Li, Dongping Liu, Pijun Liu, Peifeng Yu, Wenwen Yu. (Akers, Patrick)
October 12, 2023 Filing 31 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing VIA ZOOM - NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited*** Status Conference re Jurisdiction set for 10/17/2023 at 1:30 PM before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Based upon the Court's finding regarding jurisdiction, it may hear from the parties regarding the TRO. (Court Staff, sbh)
October 12, 2023 Filing 30 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B. Johnson: Status Conference held on 10/12/2023 (Court Reporter: Melanie Sonntag) (Court Staff, sbh)
October 12, 2023 Filing 29 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Patrick R. Akers on behalf of AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu, Yanqin Chen (Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BWYDC-2327508) (Akers, Patrick) Added filers on 10/12/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 11, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs Fengzhen Ai, AiShang You Limited, Yanqin Chen, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Min Li, Dongping Liu, Pijun Liu, Peifeng Yu, Wenwen Yu (Hickey, Patrick)
October 11, 2023 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 Motion to Intervene filed by Movant WeTrade Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Angus Ni ISO Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit 1) (Yang, Serena) Modified text on 10/11/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 10, 2023 Filing 26 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: VIA ZOOM - NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely;the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** Status Conference set for 10/12/2023 01:30 PM before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #21 , #22 , #23 MOTIONS for Patrick R. Akers, John J. Elliott and Michael H. Ference to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Peifeng Yu, AiShang You Limited, Min Li, Dongping Liu, Pijun Liu, Yanqin Chen, Fengzhen Ai, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Wenwen Yu (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
October 10, 2023 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Fengzhen Ai, AiShang You Limited, Yanqin Chen, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Min Li, Dongping Liu, Pijun Liu, Peifeng Yu, Wenwen Yu, identifying LLC Members Michael J. Turner, III, Paul E. Flesche, and George A. Castillo for Globex Transfer LLC (Hickey, Patrick). Modified text on 10/11/2023 (Court Staff, stmo).
October 10, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael H. Ference to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu, Yanqin Chen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hickey, Patrick) Modified filers and text on 10/10/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 10, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John J. Elliott to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu, Yanqin Chen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hickey, Patrick) Modified filers and text on 10/10/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 10, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Patrick R. Akers to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu, Yanqin Chen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Hickey, Patrick) Modified filers and text on 10/10/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 9, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Serena Yang on behalf of WeTrade Group Inc (Yang, Serena)
October 9, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Zhen Er Low on behalf of WeTrade Group Inc (Low, Zhen Er)
October 9, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Angus Ni on behalf of WeTrade Group Inc (Ni, Angus)
October 5, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR ZHENER LOW. RECEIPT 2-2153. (Court Staff, sjk)
October 5, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR ANGUS F NI. RECEIPT 2-2152. (Court Staff, sjk)
October 5, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR SERENA YUE YANG. RECEIPT 2-2154. (Court Staff, sjk)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #11 , #12 , #13 MOTIONS for Angus F. Ni, Zhener Low and Serena Yue Yang to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Movant WeTrade Group Inc (Order emailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
October 5, 2023 Filing 16 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing on #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. IN-PERSON Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2023 at 1:30 PM before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, ssw)
October 5, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant WeTrade Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nethercott, Tara)
October 5, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Movant WeTrade Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Angus F. Ni, #2 Declaration of Translator Certifying Translation Accuracy, #3 Declaration of Annie Huang, #4 Declaration of Guo Biming, #5 Declaration of Wei Hechun, #6 Declaration of Qin Ning, #7 Declaration of Ye Yuxing, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit H, #16 Exhibit I, #17 Exhibit J, #18 Exhibit K, #19 Exhibit L, #20 Exhibit M, #21 Exhibit N, #22 Exhibit O, #23 Exhibit P, #24 Exhibit Q, #25 Exhibit R, #26 Exhibit S, #27 Exhibit T, #28 Exhibit U, #29 Exhibit V, #30 Exhibit W, #31 Exhibit X, #32 Exhibit Y, #33 Exhibit Z) (Nethercott, Tara)
October 5, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Serena Yue Yang to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movant WeTrade Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nethercott, Tara)
October 5, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Zhener Low to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movant WeTrade Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nethercott, Tara)
October 5, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Angus F. Ni to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Movant WeTrade Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nethercott, Tara) Modified text on 10/5/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 4, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tara Brooke Nethercott on behalf of WeTrade Group Inc (Nethercott, Tara)
October 4, 2023 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Patrick J. Hickey Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 65(b) by Plaintiffs AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu, Yanqin Chen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hickey, Patrick) Modified filers on 10/5/2023 and text on 10/10/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 28, 2023 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Plaintiffs AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu, Yanqin Chen (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 19 Leff Declaration, #2 Exhibit 20 September 28th 8-K) (Hickey, Patrick) Modified text on 10/3/2023 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 10/5/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 Summonses (7) Issued (Court Staff, sal)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Judge Assignment. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (presiding) and the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (referral). (Court Staff, sal)
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Plaintiffs AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu, Yanqin Chen (Hickey, Patrick) Modified event text on 9/29/2023 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified text on 10/3/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick J Hickey on behalf of AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu, Yanqin Chen (Hickey, Patrick) Modified text on 10/3/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 28, 2023 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu, Yanqin Chen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Articles, #2 Exhibit 2 Bylaws, #3 Exhibit 3 Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 First Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 Second Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 Resignation Letters, #7 Exhibit 7 August 1st 8-K, #8 Exhibit 8 August 31st 8-K, #9 Exhibit 9 September 15th 8-K, #10 Exhibit 10 Sept. 21, 2023 Letter to Globex, #11 Exhibit 11 September 22nd Shareholder Consent, #12 Exhibit 12 Sept. 22, 2023 First Board Consent, #13 Exhibit 13 Sept. 22, 2023 Second Board Consent, #14 Exhibit 14 Sept. 26, 2023 Letter to Globex, #15 Exhibit 15 Sept. 26, 2023 Email from Globex, #16 Exhibit 16 Sept. 27, 2023 Letter from Globex, #17 Affidavit 17 Zheng Declaration, #18 Affidavit 18 Jiang Declaration) (Hickey, Patrick) Modified text on 9/29/2023 and 10/3/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 28, 2023 Filing 2 Ex-Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs AiShang You Limited, Dada Business Trading Co Limited, Dongping Liu, Fengzhen Ai, Min Li, Peifeng Yu, Pijun Liu, Wenwen Yu, Yanqin Chen (Hickey, Patrick) Modified text on 9/29/2023 and 10/3/2023 (Court Staff, sbh). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 9/29/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
September 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guo Biming, Globex Transfer, LLC, Li Grace, Wei Hechun, Annie Huang, Tat Che Kean, Qin Ning, Ye Yuxing (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number AWYDC-2320192) Attorney Patrick J Hickey added to party AiShang You Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Hickey added to party Dada Business Trading Co., Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Hickey added to party Liu Dongping(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Hickey added to party Ai Fengzhen (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Hickey added to party Li Min(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Hickey added to party Yu Peifeng (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Hickey added to party Liu Pijun (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Hickey added to party WeTrade Group, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Hickey added to party Yu Wenwen (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick J Hickey added to party Chen Yanqin (pty:pla), filed by Liu Pijun, Dada Business Trading Co., Limited, AiShang You Limited, Yu Peifeng, Liu Dongping, Chen Yanqin, Yu Wenwen, Ai Fengzhen, WeTrade Group, Inc., Li Min. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Articles, #2 Exhibit 2 Bylaws, #3 Exhibit 3 Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 First Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 Second Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 Resignation Letters, #7 Exhibit 7 August 1st 8-K, #8 Exhibit 8 August 31st 8-K, #9 Exhibit 9 September 15th 8-K, #10 Exhibit 10 Sept. 21, 2023 Letter to Globex, #11 Exhibit 11 September 22nd Shareholder Consent, #12 Exhibit 12 Sept. 22, 2023 First Board Consent, #13 Exhibit 13 Sept. 22, 2023 Second Board Consent, #14 Exhibit 14 Sept. 26, 2023 Letter to Globex, #15 Exhibit 15 Sept. 26, 2023 Email from Globex, #16 Exhibit 16 Sept. 27, 2023 Letter from Globex, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Summons (Biming Guo), #19 Summons (Grace Li), #20 Summons (Ning Qin), #21 Summons (Yuxing Ye), #22 Summons (Hechun Wei), #23 Summons (Che Kean Tat), #24 Summons (Annie Huang)) (Hickey, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AiShang You Limited et al v. Guo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AiShang You Limited
Represented By: Patrick J Hickey
Represented By: Patrick R. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dada Business Trading Co Limited
Represented By: Patrick J Hickey
Represented By: Patrick R. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dongping Liu
Represented By: Patrick J Hickey
Represented By: Patrick R. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fengzhen Ai
Represented By: Patrick J Hickey
Represented By: Patrick R. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Min Li
Represented By: Patrick J Hickey
Represented By: Patrick R. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peifeng Yu
Represented By: Patrick J Hickey
Represented By: Patrick R. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pijun Liu
Represented By: Patrick J Hickey
Represented By: Patrick R. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenwen Yu
Represented By: Patrick J Hickey
Represented By: Patrick R. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanqin Chen
Represented By: Patrick J Hickey
Represented By: Patrick R. Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biming Guo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ning Qin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuxing Ye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hechun Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Che Kean Tat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globex Transfer LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kean Tat Che
Represented By: Angus Ni
Represented By: Tara Brooke Nethercott
Represented By: Serena Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WeTrade Group Inc
Represented By: Tara Brooke Nethercott
Represented By: Angus Ni
Represented By: Serena Yang
Represented By: Zhen Er Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?