Bielski v. Alfred Saliba Corporation, et al

Defendant: Real Estate Services of Dothan, Inc. and Alfred Saliba Corporation
Plaintiff: Kathryn Bielski
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01049
Filed: November 30, 2012
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that the plaintiff Kathryn Bielski has until December 14, 2012, to amend the complaint to allege jurisdiction sufficiently; otherwise this lawsuit shall be dismissed without prejudice, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/5/12. (scn, )
October 10, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The court having been informed that this cause is now settled as to defendant Real Estate Services of Dothan, Inc., it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that defendant Real Estate Services of Dothan, Inc. and the claims aga inst it are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave to the parties, within 49 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal or to stipulate to the entry of judgment instead of dismissal, and with le ave to any party to file, within 49 days, a motion to have the dismissal set aside and the claims reinstated or the settlement enforced, should the settlement not be consummated. Defendant Real Estate Services of Dothan, Inc. is terminated as a par ty. It is further ORDERED that the motions for summary judgment 26 and to exclude 29 are denied as moot. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )
October 15, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Strike, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/15/13. (scn, )
October 15, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon consideration of the parties' motions in limine (Doc. Nos. 71 and 80 ) and objections (Doc. Nos. 63 , 64 , 72 , 73 , and 74 ), it is ORDERED that counsel for all parties are to do the following: (1) Meet, in person, by no later than October 23, 2013, to attempt to resolve the motions and objections; and (2) File a jointly prepared report by October 28, 2013, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/15/13. (scn, )
October 16, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the Alfred Saliba Corporations motion for summary judgment (doc. no. 22 ) is denied, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/16/13. (scn, )
October 18, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The court having been informed that this cause is now settled, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave to the parties, within 49 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal or to stipulate to the entry of judgment instead of dismissal, and with leave to any party to file, within 49 days, a motion to have the dismissal set aside and the case rein stated or the settlement enforced, should the settlement not be consummated. It is further ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot and all outstanding objections are overruled as moot. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this doc ument on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, ) TERMINATED: Jury Selection 11/04/2013; Jury Trial 11/04/2013

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bielski v. Alfred Saliba Corporation, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Estate Services of Dothan, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald Carl Swann, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Saliba Corporation
Represented By: Leon Augustus Boyd, V
Represented By: Herman Warren Cobb, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Bielski
Represented By: Lanny S. Vines
Represented By: Rufus Randolph Smith, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]