Iberia Bank v. Polk, et al

Defendant: Polk Family Properties, LLC and William R. Polk
Plaintiff: Iberia Bank
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00639
Filed: July 25, 2012
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Coody
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 26 Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED; further ORDERED that Mr. Polk, with the assistance of counsel for Defendant Polk Family Properties, LLC, file a status report on or before March 29, 2013, as further set out; further ORDER ED that the 27 motion is due to be GRANTED PART and DENIED IN PART to give Mr. Polk the time necessary to obtain new counsel, as further set out; further ORDERED that: (1) The parties' deadline for filing dispositive motions, currently set to expire on March 13, 2013, pursuant to the 25 Scheduling Order in this case, is CONTINUED through and including May 13, 2013; and (2) The parties' deadline for completing discovery, currently set to expire on May 15, 2013, is CONTINUED through and including July 15, 2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/1/13. (scn, )
April 29, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) The parties' deadline for completing discovery, currently set to expire on May 15, 2013, pursuant to the 33 Amended Scheduling Order, is CONTINUED through and including July 15, 2013; (2) The parties' deadline for filing dispositive motions, currently set to expire on May 13, 2013 (Order, Doc. # 31 ), is CONTINUED through and including July 5, 2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/29/13. (scn, )
May 14, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon consideration of the parties' arguments, it is hereby ORDERED that Polk file a supplement to his previously-filed 40 Motion to Continue on or before May 21, 2013, which specifically addresses any deadlines in the 25 Uniform Scheduling Order and the 33 Amended Scheduling Order that Polk seeks to extend (or reopen) and provides new deadlines for the Court's consideration, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/14/13. (scn, )
June 3, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon consideration of Defendant William R. Polk's 40 Motion to Continue, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED for good cause shown. Trial in this case is CONTINUED until March 10, 2014, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/3/13. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)(Term'd: Non Jury Trial 11/04/2013)(scn, )
July 26, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re 73 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines: that this matter is set for a telephonic status conference on July 31, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. Polk's counsel is further instructed to initiate the telephone call. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/26/2013. (jg, )
August 2, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 1. The pretrial conference and trial setting in this case are CONTINUEDGENERALLY; 2. The deadlines set forth in Sections 2, 3, 5, 7, 8, and 9 of the Amended Scheduling Order 50 , and the deadlines set forth in the Court's July 2, 2013 Or der 62 are CONTINUED GENERALLY; 3. The parties shall pursue discovery in this case expeditiously; 4. This case is REFERRED to the assigned magistrate judge for a discovery conference as further set out; 5. The Motion for Extension of Deadline as to Expert Witnesses 73 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/2/2013. (jg, ) TERMINATED: Final Pretrial Conference 02/06/2014; Non-Jury Trial 03/10/2014
October 18, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 1. FCB's Motion to Dismiss Claims Voiding Mortgage 80 is GRANTED as to Iberia's claims against FCB under § 8-9A-4(c) in Count 1 and as to all of Iberia's claims against FCB in Count 2, and these claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 2. FCB's Motion to Dismiss Claims Voiding Mortgage 80 is DENIED as to Iberia's claims against FCB under § 8-9A-4(a) in Count 1. 3. Iberia's Motion to Allow Third Amended Complaint 89 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Iberia Bank v. Polk, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polk Family Properties, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Polk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iberia Bank
Represented By: Michael Warren Butler
Represented By: John Paul Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Scott David Stevens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]