Alabama Legislative Black Caucus et al v. The State of Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Fred Armstead, George Bowman, Rhondel Rhone, Albert F. Turner, Jr., Jiles Williams, Jr., Alabama Legislative Black Caucus, Bobby Singleton and Alabama Association of Black County Officials
Defendant: The State of Alabama and Beth Chapman
Case Number: 2:2012cv00691
Filed: August 10, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Hale
0 Judge: Wallace Capel
1 Judge: William H Pryor
2 Judge: Myron H. Thompson
3 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: We DENY the 93 Motion to alter or amend our judgment. We sua sponte VACATE our initial 89 order denying the 66 second motion for partial summary judgment and SUBSTITUTE this memorandum opinion and order. We DENY th e 66 second motion for a partial summary judgment for the reasons stated in the opinion and order. Signed by Circuit Judge William H Pryor, Jr. and Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(dmn, )
April 5, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court THOMPSON, District Judge, concurring with 101 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/5/2013. (dmn, )
August 2, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: On consideration of the motions, reply, and response (Docs. 95 , 106 , 107 , 108 , 109 ) as well as supporting and opposing authority, it is ORDERED that the motion by the State defendants for a partial summary judg ment as to the claim of partisan gerrymandering in count three of the amended complaint filed by the Black Caucus plaintiffs is GRANTED. We DISMISS the facial challenge under the Equal Protection Clause in count three of the amended complaint filed b y the Black Caucus plaintiffs for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The motion by the Black Caucus plaintiffs for reconsideration of our order denying their motion for a partial summary judgment as to count three of their amended complaint is DENI ED. The motion by the Black Caucus plaintiffs for entry of a permanent injunction is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Circuit Judge William H. Pryor, Jr., and Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(dmn, )
August 2, 2013 175 Opinion or Order of the Court THOMPSON, District Judge, concurring in part and dissenting in part with 174 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/2/2013. (dmn, )
December 20, 2013 203 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as further set out in the opinion and order. A separate final judgment will follow. By Circuit Judge William H Pryor, Jr. entered on 12/20/2013. Before PRYOR, Circuit Judge, WATKINS, Chief District Judge, and THOMPSON, District Judge. (dmn, )
December 20, 2013 204 Opinion or Order of the Court THOMPSON, District Judge, dissenting re 203 Memorandum Opinion and Order. By Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson entered on 12/20/2013. (dmn, )
December 26, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the 7 motion by the Black Caucus for partial summary judgment and for preliminary and permanent injunction as to count one of its complaint is DENIED; the 29 motion by the State defendants for judgment on the pleadings as to count one of the complaint filed by the Black Caucus is GRANTED; the 29 motion by the State defendants for judgment on the pleadings as to count two of that complaint is DENIED; count three of that complaint is DISMISSED WITH OUT PREJUDICE; We GRANT the Black Caucus leave to amend its complaint within 21 days from the date of this order; the 29 motion by the State defendants for judgment on the pleadings as to count three of that complaint is DENIED AS MOOT; as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins, United States Circuit Judge William H. Pryor, Jr., and United States District Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/26/12. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabama Legislative Black Caucus et al v. The State of Alabama et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Armstead
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Represented By: U. W. Clemon
Represented By: Wilson Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Bowman
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Represented By: U. W. Clemon
Represented By: Wilson Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhondel Rhone
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Represented By: U. W. Clemon
Represented By: Wilson Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert F. Turner, Jr.
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Represented By: U. W. Clemon
Represented By: Wilson Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiles Williams, Jr.
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Represented By: U. W. Clemon
Represented By: Wilson Edward Still
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Legislative Black Caucus
Represented By: Wilson Edward Still
Represented By: U. W. Clemon
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Singleton
Represented By: Wilson Edward Still
Represented By: U. W. Clemon
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Association of Black County Officials
Represented By: Wilson Edward Still
Represented By: U. W. Clemon
Represented By: James Uriah Blacksher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Alabama
Represented By: James William Davis
Represented By: Misty Shawn Fairbanks Messick
Represented By: John Joseph Park, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Chapman
Represented By: James William Davis
Represented By: Misty Shawn Fairbanks Messick
Represented By: John Joseph Park, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]