Ford v. City of Goodwater, Alabama et al

Defendant: Gerald Whetstone, Jonathan Pitts and City of Goodwater, Alabama
Plaintiff: Brian Keith Ford
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01094
Filed: December 19, 2012
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Coosa
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2013 38 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER directing that defendant Jonathan Pitts's motion to strike (Doc. No. 29 ) is denied.. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/13. (scn, )
December 23, 2013 57 Featured Case JUDGMENT directing that, by agreement of the parties made at the pretrial on December 19, 2013, it is ORDERED that defendant Gerald Whetstone and the claims against him are dismissed, with the parties to bear their own costs. Defendant Whetstone is t erminated as a party. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/23/13. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
January 6, 2014 63 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER directing that defendant Jonathan Pitts's motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 18 ) is denied as to the state-law assault and battery claim, but granted as to all other claims; the state-law assault and battery claim against defendant Pitts will go to trial; further ORDERED that defendant City of Goodwater's motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 17 ) is denied as to the state-law negligent-hiring claim, but granted as to all other claims; the state-law negligent-hiring claim against defendant City of Goodwater will go to trial; the court retains supplemental jurisdiction over the case. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/6/14. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
January 15, 2014 90 Featured Case JUDGMENT directing that it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court: (1) That defendant Jonathan Pitts is dismissed and terminated without prejudice to the right of any party to petition to reinstate this defendant as a party to pursue any cla im embraced herein not adjudicated in or discharged by proceedings in the bankruptcy court; (2) That such reinstatement, if and when allowed, will cause the filing date of any claim so reinstated to relate back to the original filing date of this act ion against said party; and (3) That any petition for reinstatement must be filed by a party within 60 days after the bankruptcy court has taken such action that entitles that party to seek reinstatement; the clerk of the court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to the bankruptcy court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/15/14. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
January 22, 2014 96 Featured Case ORDER directing that, in light of the dismissal of defendant Jonathan Pitts, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) These objections, because they were filed by defendant Pitts, are overruled as moot: Doc. Nos. 59 , 65 , 72 , 73 , and 76 ; (2) These motions, because they were filed by defendant Pitts, are denied as moot: Doc. Nos. 68 , 69 , 70 , and 71 . Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/22/14. (scn, )
January 30, 2014 98 Featured Case JUDGMENT directing that it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave to the parties, within 49 days, to stipulate to a differ ent basis for dismissal or to stipulate to the entry of judgment instead of dismissal, and with leave to any party to file, within 49 days, a motion to have the dismissal set aside and the case reinstated or the settlement enforced, should the settle ment not be consummated; further ORDERED that no jury costs are taxed; further ORDERED that all outstanding motions are denied as moot and all outstanding objections are overruled as moot; the clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/30/14. (scn, ) (Furnished to Calendar/AG)(Term'd: Jury Trial 01/27/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ford v. City of Goodwater, Alabama et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Whetstone
Represented By: April Willis McKay
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Pitts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Goodwater, Alabama
Represented By: April Willis McKay
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Keith Ford
Represented By: Wallace Damon Mills
Represented By: Charles James, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]