Fletcher et al v. Cooper Tire & Rubber Company et al

Plaintiff: Kwamika Fletcher, Rosita Boyd and Darlene Fletcher
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company, Sheryl Smith, Estate of Tara Denita Sanders and Robert Simmons
Cross_claimant: Estate of Tara Denita Sanders and Sheryl Smith
Cross_defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company and Robert Simmons
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00156
Filed: March 13, 2013
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2013 27 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 14 MOTION to Remand is denied; (2) defendant Robert Simmons (d/b/a Simmons Used Cars) is dismissed and terminated as a party; (3) defendant estate of Tara Denita Sanders if realigned as a plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/23/13. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
July 25, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER that the motion to reconsider 30 filed by plaintiffs administratrix of the estate of Frank Carter, Kwamika Fletcher, and Rosita Boyd is granted to the extent that this court's opinion and order of May 23, 2013 27 , are vacated and another opinion and order will be issued in their place. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/25/2013. (jg, )
July 25, 2013 51 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: (1) The motion to remand 14 filed by plaintiffs administratrix of the estate of Frank Carter, Kwamika Fletcher, and Rosita Boyd is denied. (2) Defendant Robert Simmons (d/b/a Simmons Used Cars) is dismissed and terminated as a party. (3) Defendant estate of Tara Denita Sanders is realigned as a plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )
July 25, 2013 52 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER that the motion to amend 34 filed by plaintiffs administratrix of the estate of Frank Carter, Kwamika Fletcher, and Rosita Boyd is denied. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )
October 3, 2013 55 Featured Case JUDGMENT: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave to the parties, within 49 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal or to stipulate to the entry of judgment instead of dismissal, and with leave to any party to file, within 49 days, a motion to have the dismissal set aside and the case reinstated or the settlement enforced, should the settlement not be co nsummated. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is closed.Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) Copies furnished to calendar group, AG. (Deadlines terminated: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2013, Jury Trial set for 1/27/2014.)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fletcher et al v. Cooper Tire & Rubber Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwamika Fletcher
Represented By: LaBarron Nelson Boone
Represented By: Jere Locke Beasley
Represented By: Benjamin E. Baker, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosita Boyd
Represented By: LaBarron Nelson Boone
Represented By: Jere Locke Beasley
Represented By: Benjamin E. Baker, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Fletcher
Represented By: LaBarron Nelson Boone
Represented By: Jere Locke Beasley
Represented By: Benjamin E. Baker, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Richard Hunley Monk, III
Represented By: Justin Toby McDonald
Represented By: Andrew Burns Johnson
Represented By: Angela Raines Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Smith
Represented By: William Reeves Andrews
Represented By: David Hall Marsh
Represented By: Derrick A. Mills
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Tara Denita Sanders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Estate of Tara Denita Sanders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Sheryl Smith
Represented By: William Reeves Andrews
Represented By: David Hall Marsh
Represented By: Derrick A. Mills
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Andrew Burns Johnson
Represented By: Justin Toby McDonald
Represented By: Richard Hunley Monk, III
Represented By: Angela Raines Rogers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Robert Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]