Boutwell, et al v. Walker, et al (MAG+)

Plaintiff: Pamela J. Boutwell and Redbow Nln
Defendant: J. Clark Walker, Jessica Bulger, Robert Fehse and TD Auto Finance
Case Number: 2:2013cv00170
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Covington
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that the 18 motion to amend complaint is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/22/13. (scn, )
April 25, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/25/13. (scn, )
April 25, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT directing that, in accordance with the memorandum opinion entered this date, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) Plaintiffs' 16 and 17 objections are overruled; (2) The United States Magistrate Judge&# 039;s 8 recommendation is adopted; (3) This lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice; further ORDERED that plaintiffs' 19 motion to withdraw is denied; further ORDERED that costs are taxed against plaintiffs, for which execution may issue; the clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/25/13. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
April 2, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE directing: that the 2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis be and is hereby GRANTEED; that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; that on or before April 16, 2013, the parties may file objections to this Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/2/13. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boutwell, et al v. Walker, et al (MAG+)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Boutwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redbow Nln
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clark Walker
Represented By: David Gerald Poston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Bulger
Represented By: David Gerald Poston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fehse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Auto Finance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]