Middleton v. Alabama CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: James Hoyt Middleton
Defendant: Alabama CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00190
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) Mr. Middleton's 7 Motion to Substitute Parties is GRANTED; (2) Mr. Middleton's 8 Motion for Leave to Amend is GRANTED; (3) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to substitute James L. Middleton, Administrator and Personal Representative of the Estate of the late James Hoyt Middleton, as the proper party plaintiff in the style of this case and throughout the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/22/13. (scn, )
September 6, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) Plaintiffs 16 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/6/13. (scn, )
March 9, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT directing as follows: (1) Plaintiff's unopposed motion to withdraw motions to enforce settlement and tax costs (doc. no. 69 ) is granted; (2) Plaintiff's motion to enforce settlement agreement (doc. no. 51 ), amended motion to en force settlement agreement (doc. no. 66 ), motion to tax costs (doc. no. 66 ), and supplement to the amended motion to enforce settlement agreement and tax costs (doc. no. 68 ) are withdrawn; (3) This case is dismissed with prejudice in its entire ty; the clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 03/09/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton v. Alabama CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hoyt Middleton
Represented By: Julia Ann Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jack Buster Hinton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.