Roberts v. State of Alabama Department of Youth Services et al

Plaintiff: Arthur Roberts, Jr.
Defendant: State of Alabama Department of Youth Services, J. Walter Wood, Jr. and George McCree
Case Number: 2:2013cv00335
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) defendants Department of Youth Services and George McCree's 27 MOTION TO DISMISS is granted as to plf Arthur Roberts, Jr.'s Title VII retailiation claim against defendant McCree in his officia l capacity and his 1983 religious-discrimination claim against defendant Department of Youth Services; Plaintiff Roberts complaint is dismissed to this extent; (2) defendants Department of Youth Services and George McCree's 27 MOTION TO DIS MISS is denied to plaintiff Roberts's Title VII retaliation claim against Department of Youth Services; This claim will go forward; (3) plaintiff Roberts is allowed until 8/15/2013 to amend his complaint, as further set out in order; the court reserves ruling on defendants Department of Youth Services and McCree's 17 motion to dismiss to this extent. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/9/13. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
February 11, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Strike, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/11/15. (djy, )
February 11, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/11/15. (djy, )
February 11, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, in accordance with the opinion entered this date, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) the 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part; (2) summary judgment is entered in favor of d ef Sate of Alabama Dept of Youth Services on plf Arthur Robers, Jr.'s religious-discrimination claim; (3) summary judgment is entered in full in favor of def George McCree, and defendant McCree is terminated as a party; (4) this case will procee d to trial on plf Roberts's retaliation claim against def State of Alabama Dept of Youth Services; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/11/15. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
February 23, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, the court having been informed that this cause is now settled, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, as further set out in order; further ORDERING that all outstandi ng motions are denied as moot; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/23/15. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist). Furnished to calendar group & AG (terminates Jury Selection and Jury Trial 02/23/2015).(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. State of Alabama Department of Youth Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Amardo Wesley Pitters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Department of Youth Services
Represented By: Thornton Dudley Perry, Jr.
Represented By: Lynne Riddle Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Walter Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Thornton Dudley Perry, Jr.
Represented By: Lynne Riddle Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George McCree
Represented By: Thornton Dudley Perry, Jr.
Represented By: Lynne Riddle Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.