Freddie Mac v. Brooks, et al

Defendant: Homer Brooks, Jr. and Letha Brooks
Counter_claimant: Letha Brooks
Counter_defendant: Freddie Mac, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., MERSCORP, Inc., PNC Mortgage, Prommis Solutions, LLC, Prommis Solutions Holding Corporation and McCalla Raymer, LLC
Plaintiff: Freddie Mac
Case Number: 3:2011cv00313
Filed: April 22, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Chambers
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 12:1452
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that 1. The Motion to Remand 32 is DENIED. 2. Because the Motion to Remand has been resolved, Defendants shall show cause, if any there be, on or before July 15, 2011, why Plaintiff Freddie Mac's Motion to Dismiss 25 should not be granted. Plaintiff Freddie Mac shall have until July 22, 2011, to file any reply it may wish to file. The motion will be taken under submission on that day for determination without oral argument. 3. Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice 42 , McCalla Raymer, LLC is DISMISSED from this case with prejudice, on a pro tanto basis. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 7/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )
July 12, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Letha Brooks shall show cause, if any there be, on or before July 25, 2011, why the 46 motion to dismiss should not be granted. The moving Counterclaim Defendants shall have until August 1, 2011, to file any reply they may wish to file. The motion will be taken under submission on that day for determination without oral argument. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 7/12/2011. (jg, )
July 29, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dfts / Counterclaim Plfs shall show cause, if any there be, on or before 8/12/2011, why Counterclaim Dft PNC Mortgage's 34 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted; PNC Mortgage shall have until 8/19/2011, to file any reply it may wish to file, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 7/29/2011. (wcl, )
August 25, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Freddie Mac's Motion to Dismiss 25 is GRANTED, and all counterclaims against it are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/25/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freddie Mac v. Brooks, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Brooks, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letha Brooks
Represented By: Nicholas Heath Wooten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Letha Brooks
Represented By: Nicholas Heath Wooten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Freddie Mac
Represented By: David H. Pittinsky
Represented By: William Thomas Paulk
Represented By: Kent Edward Altom
Represented By: Kenneth Daniel Sansom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Boese
Represented By: Robert M. Brochin
Represented By: Barry Alan Ragsdale
Represented By: Meaghan Elizabeth Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: MERSCORP, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Boese
Represented By: Robert M. Brochin
Represented By: Barry Alan Ragsdale
Represented By: Meaghan Elizabeth Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: PNC Mortgage
Represented By: William Thomas Paulk
Represented By: David H. Pittinsky
Represented By: Kenneth Daniel Sansom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Prommis Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Donald Keith Andress
Represented By: Catherine Crosby Long
Represented By: James Herbert White, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Prommis Solutions Holding Corporation
Represented By: Donald Keith Andress
Represented By: Catherine Crosby Long
Represented By: James Herbert White, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: McCalla Raymer, LLC
Represented By: Kent Edward Altom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Mac
Represented By: Kenneth Daniel Sansom
Represented By: David H. Pittinsky
Represented By: William Thomas Paulk
Represented By: Kent Edward Altom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]