United States of America v. One Parcel of Property Located at 9607 Lee Road 72, Waverly, Lee County, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Parcel of Property Located at 9607 Lee Road 72, Waverly, Lee County, Alabama and One Parcel of Property Located at 8895 Lee Road 72, Waverly, Lee County, Alabama
Case Number: 3:2011cv00937
Filed: November 1, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The court appoints Honorable Karen Mastin Laneaux, Law Office of Sandra Lewis, PC, P. O. Box 686, Montgomery, Alabama 36101-0686, to monitor the legal competency of claimant Broderick Zellers as further set out in order; Plaintiff United States of America shall pay the fees and expenses of the monitor as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/26/2013. (jg, )
March 19, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) The 137 motion to set aside is granted; (2) The 127 judgment is set aside and vacated. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/19/2014. (wcl, )
March 19, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court DECREE OF FORFEITURE AS TO ONE PARCEL OF PROPERTY LOCATED AT 9607 LEE ROAD 72, WAVERLY, LEE COUNTY, ALABAMA, WITH ALL APPURTENANCES AND IMPROVEMENTS THEREON (Tax Map No. 43-06-07-26-0-000-026.002): it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the 138 motion is granted, as further set out in order; This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/19/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(wcl, )
September 24, 2014 166 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. The court declines to set aside the default against Nelms. An appropriate order will be entered granting plaintiff United States of America's motion for partial decree of forfeiture and severance as to the interest of Nelms in 8895 Lee Road, Waverly, Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/24/2014. (dmn, )
October 10, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT directing that, based upon plaintiff United States of America's motion for approval of stipulation for compromise settlement between plaintiff United States and claimants Charlie Mae Parker, Tazzar Nelms, Yolanda Zellers and Broderick Z ellers, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that: (1) The motion (doc. no. 170 ) is granted; (2) The stipulation for compromise settlement (doc. no. 170 ) is approved; (3) The parties are each to bear their own costs, other than as s tated in the stipulation for compromise settlement; (4) Plaintiff United States shall file a motion for final order of forfeiture upon payment consistent with the stipulation of compromise settlement; The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/10/14. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
November 21, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER as follows: (1) Dr. Karl Kirkland is appointed to perform a psychological evaluation of claimant Broderick Zellers. The United States is to bear the cost of Dr. Kirkland's time and expenses. (2) Within 14 days, claimant Zeller s is to meet with Dr. Kirkland for the purpose of having a psychological evaluation conducted. (3) Within 21 days, Dr. Kirkland shall prepare a psychological report and shall file said report with this court as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/2012. (jg, )
December 28, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motion of the United States for a Decree of Forfeiture 91 is GRANTED as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/28/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Parcel of Property Located at 9607 Lee Road 72, Waverly, Lee County, Alabama et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tommie Brown Hardwick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Parcel of Property Located at 9607 Lee Road 72, Waverly, Lee County, Alabama
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Parcel of Property Located at 8895 Lee Road 72, Waverly, Lee County, Alabama
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]