Roberts v. SR&F Architects et al

Defendant: Martin G. Roach, SR&F Architects and Donald H. Allen Developments, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jarrod Stewart Roberts
Case Number: 3:2012cv00985
Filed: November 6, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to the 30 joint stipulation of dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that def SR&F Architects and the claims against it are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs; def SR&F is te rminated as a party; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/15/13. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
May 9, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT, pursuant to the 30 joint stipulation of dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that defendant SR&F Architects and the claims against it and the counterclaims brought by it are dismissed with prejudice, with t he parties to bear their own costs; def SR&F Architects is terminated as a party; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/9/13. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
May 13, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to the 30 joint stipulation of dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that def Martin G. Roach and the claims against him and the counterclaims brought by him are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties t o bear their own costs; def Roach is terminated as a party; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is not closed. (Attachment(s): # 1 civil appeals checklist) . Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/13/13. (djy, )
July 12, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to the 35 joint stipulation of dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that defendant David H. Allen Development, Inc. and the claims against it and the counterclaims brought by it are dismissed with prejudic e, with the parties to bear their own costs; Said defendant is terminated as a party; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/12/13. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist). Furnished to calendar group & AG (terminates Pretrial Conference 11/15/2013 and Non-Jury Trial 12/16/2013).(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. SR&F Architects et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin G. Roach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SR&F Architects
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H. Allen Developments, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod Stewart Roberts
Represented By: Michael Sandlin Denniston
Represented By: Brie L.B. Buchanan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]