Love v. Centaur Building Services Southeast, Inc.

Defendant: Centaur Building Services Southeast, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kinera Love
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00204
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion to Extend Deadline for Amendments and to Add Parties, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/12/2013. (wcl, )
March 4, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT directing that it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave to the parties, within 49 days, to stipulate to a differ ent basis for dismissal or to stipulate to the entry of judgment instead of dismissal, and with leave to any party to file, within 49 days, a motion to have the dismissal set aside and the case reinstated or the settlement enforced, should the settle ment not be consummated; further ORDERED that all outstanding motions are denied as moot; the clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/4/14. (Furnished to Calendar/AG)(Term'd: Final PTC 03/07/2014 and Jury Trial 04/14/2014) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, ) Modified on 3/4/2014 to correct signature date in docket text (scn, ).
March 10, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT directing that, pursuant to the joint stipulation of dismissal (Doc. No. 45 ), it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this cause is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs; the cle rk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/10/14. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Love v. Centaur Building Services Southeast, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centaur Building Services Southeast, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinera Love
Represented By: Lateefah Muhammad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]