James v. Baldwin Bone & Joint, P.C. et al

Plaintiff: Austin E. James
Defendant: Baldwin Bone & Joint, P.C., Rhett Hubley and Daniel K. Stubler
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00254
Filed: May 7, 2009
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2011 107 Featured Case Order on Jury Trial held on April 18, 19 and 20, 2011. The jury found in favor of the defendants, Dr. Rhett Hubley and Baldwin Bone and Joint and against plaintiff, Austin James. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Verdict) (mca)
October 7, 2009 23 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Answer filed by Baldwin Bone & Joint, P.C., Rhett Hubley, 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Daniel K. Stubler, recommending that Defendants' motions be denied as set out. Objections to R&R due by 10/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/6/09. (cmj)
November 4, 2009 28 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Answer filed by Baldwin Bone & Joint, P.C., Rhett Hubley & 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Daniel K. Stubler. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss are DENIED as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/4/09. Copies to parties.(mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: James v. Baldwin Bone & Joint, P.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin E. James
Represented By: Stephen D. Heninger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin Bone & Joint, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhett Hubley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel K. Stubler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]