Escapes!, Inc. v. Legacy Land & Developments, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Escapes!, Inc.
Defendant: Legacy Land & Developments, LLC, Escapes Acquisition Co., LLC, William Kearney, Allan A. Buniak and Delores Balliett
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00515
Filed: August 10, 2009
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2011 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part and deferring in part 192 Motion for Sanctions as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/14/2011. (cmj)
March 22, 2011 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 209 Motion to Enforce Subpoena. Non-party Baker Donelson is ORDERED to respond to the subpoenas by producing only the non-privileged documents and communications in its file related to Defendants' proposed purchase of the property at issue in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/22/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
June 23, 2011 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 249 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and granting 223 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant William Kearney and defendant Dolores Balliett.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/23/2011. (copy mailed to Kearney and Balliett) (cmj)
June 23, 2011 260 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Escapes!, Inc. against Delores Balliett and William Kearney, granting plaintiff's motion for default judgment (223). Defendant Allan Buniak remains in this action. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/23/2011. (copy to Kearney and Balliett) (cmj)
July 27, 2012 314 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 311 MOTION to Supplement and Submit Newly Discovered Evidence in Support of Motion for Entry of Damages filed by Escapes!, Inc.. Plaintiff is to file, by 8/3/2012, evidence in support of the $16,355.633.78 in damag es as a Supplement to both the 306 motion for damages and 309 motion for default judgment. Defendants are to file any Response in Opposition to the 306 and 309 Motions by 8/10/2012. Damages Hearing set for 8/16/2012 at 01:00 PM in US C ourthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose. The Final Pre-Trial Conference and the parties' Joint Pretrial Document filing requirement is CANCELED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/27/2012. copies mailed certified mail as directed. (sdb)
October 29, 2012 367 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 365 Balliett's Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order ; denying 366 Kearney's Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/26/2012. (copies mailed as directed) (cmj)
December 1, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delores Balliett, recommending that Defendants' Motion be denied. Objections to R&R due by 12/11/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/30/09. (cmj)
December 15, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 40 re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delores Balliett, stating that Defendants' Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/14/09. Copies to parties on 12/15/09.(mpp)
February 18, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 41 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Kearney, recommending that Defendant Kearney's Motion be denied and that this action be allowed to continue. Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/17/2010. (cmj)
March 8, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 72 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 41 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Kearney, recommending that Defendant Kearney's Motion be denied and that this action be allowed to continue. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/5/2010. (copies mailed) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Escapes!, Inc. v. Legacy Land & Developments, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Escapes!, Inc.
Represented By: P. Russel Myles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Land & Developments, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escapes Acquisition Co., LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kearney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan A. Buniak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delores Balliett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]